|
14.01.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2013 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
19.11.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.2013 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2013 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
8 |
|
20.08.2013 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
18.02.2009 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2008 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.12.2008 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2008 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.12.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.12.2008 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2008 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2008 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.07.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2008 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2008 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2008 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2008 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.05.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2008 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2008 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.02.2008 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2007 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.03.2007 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2007 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.03.2007 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2006 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.12.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.12.2006 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2005 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2005 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.2005 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2005 |
(Partial) set of drawings filed in response to formal objections |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
30.06.2005 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2005 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2005 |
Declaration that a search is not possible |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2005 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2005 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
23.05.2005 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
87 |
|
09.05.2005 |
Invitation to remedy deficiencies in application documents |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |