|
09.04.2015 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
10.03.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.03.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.01.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.09.2014 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
24.09.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2014 |
Communication: patent lapsed |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.04.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.03.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2014 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2012 |
Request for a change of address - opponent |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.12.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
22.07.2011 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
24.05.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Notice of appeal/statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
28.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.12.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.12.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.12.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.12.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.12.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.12.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.07.2010 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.07.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.05.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.04.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.01.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.12.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
17.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
11.09.2008 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
01.09.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2008 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2007 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2007 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2007 |
Communication regarding the forthcoming grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2007 |
Communication concerning non paid of designation fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2007 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.12.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2006 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.12.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
28.11.2006 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2006 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2006 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2006 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2006 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2005 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
27.04.2005 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2005 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2005 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.04.2005 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.04.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
18.04.2005 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2005 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.04.2005 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |