EP1561763 - Olefin polymerization catalyst system, polymerization process and polymer therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Univation Technologies, LLC 5555 San Felipe Suite 1950 Houston, TX 77056-2723 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/32] | For all designated states Univation Technologies, LLC 5555 San Felipe Suite 1950 Houston, TX 77056-2723 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murray, Rex E. 5921 Dalewood Drive, Apartment 522 Cross Lanes, West Virginia 25313 / US | 02 /
Mawson, Simon 318 South Point Charleston, West Virginia 25314 / US | 03 /
Williams, Clark C. 21403 Willowford Park Drive Katy, Texas 77450 / US | 04 /
Schreck, David James 504 S. Lakeshore Drive Lake City, Minnesota 55041 / US | [2005/42] |
Former [2005/32] | 01 /
Murray, Rex E. 5921 Dalewood Drive, Apartment 522 Cross Lanes, West Virginia 25313 / US | ||
02 /
Mawson, Simon 318 South Point Charleston, West Virginia 25314 / US | |||
03 /
Williams, Clark C. 1105 Skytop Circle Charleston, West Virginia 25314 / US | |||
04 /
Schreck, David James 5226 Sun Valley Drive Cross Lanes, West Virginia 25313 / US | Representative(s) | Bublak, Wolfgang Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Bublak, Wolfgang Bardehle, Pagenberg, Dost, Altenburg, Geissler, Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/32] | Bublak, Wolfgang Bardehle, Pagenberg, Dost, Altenburg, Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05008539.8 | 19.11.1999 | [2005/32] | Priority number, date | US19980215706 | 18.12.1998 Original published format: US 215706 | US19980216163 | 18.12.1998 Original published format: US 216163 | US19980216215 | 18.12.1998 Original published format: US 216215 | US19980213627 | 18.12.1998 Original published format: US 213627 | [2005/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1561763 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00, C08F4/60 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP);
C08F4/60 (KR);
C08F210/16 (EP);
C08F4/65904 (EP);
C08F4/65912 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/64044 (EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/659 (EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/17, C08F2500/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/32] | Title | German: | Katalysatorsystem für Olefinpolymerisation, Polymerisationsverfahren und Polymer davon | [2005/32] | English: | Olefin polymerization catalyst system, polymerization process and polymer therefrom | [2005/32] | French: | Système catalytique de polymérisation d'oléfine, procédé de polymérisation et polymère ainsi obtenu | [2005/32] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 20.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 15.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/43] | 06.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/43] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99963936.2 / EP1144465 | Request for further processing for: | 15.09.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 15.09.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.09.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0619325 (FINA RESEARCH [BE]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [X]WO9849208 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO9901460 (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US]) [XP] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A] - GIBSON V C ET AL, Synthesis and structural characterisation of aluminium imino-amide and pyridyl-amide complexes: bulky monoanionic N,N chelate ligands via methyl group transfer, JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, PAGE(S) 453-456, (19980115), ISSN 0022-328X, XP004109893 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-328X(97)00552-4 |