EP1591295 - Hydraulic drive system and improved control valve assembly therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | [2008/32] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Singh, Rodney V. 8531 139th Street Savage Minnesota 55378 / US | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstraße 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Schwan - Schwan - Schorer Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05009052.1 | 25.04.2005 | [2005/44] | Priority number, date | US20040832967 | 27.04.2004 Original published format: US 832967 | [2005/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1591295 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1591295 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | [2006/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1591295 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60K17/10, B60K6/12, F15B13/01, F15B1/033 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
B60K6/12 (EP,US);
A45D1/02 (KR);
F15B1/024 (EP,US);
F15B13/0405 (EP,US);
F15B13/0426 (EP,US);
F15B13/043 (EP,US);
F15B21/14 (EP,US);
F16D31/02 (EP,US);
F16K31/406 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/44] | B60K17/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2007/14] |
Former [2005/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hydraulisches Antriebssystem und Steuerventil- Anordnung dafür | [2005/44] | English: | Hydraulic drive system and improved control valve assembly therefor | [2005/44] | French: | Système d'entraînement hydraulique et arrangement de vanne de commande pour un tel système | [2005/44] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/06] | 09.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4064694 (BAUDOIN PATRICE) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US4307654 (DE ALMEIDA ANTONIO A R) [A] 1 * column 4, line 45 - line 52; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9732136 (BERINGER HYDRAULIK AG [CH], et al) [A] 1 * page 33, line 20 - page 34, line 5; figures 5,6 *; | [A]DE19755120 (MANNESMANN REXROTH AG [DE]) [A] 1-3,7 * column 10, line 1 - line 53; figures 3-6 * * column 11, line 26 - line 60; figures 9,10 * * column 13, line 63 - column 14, line 9 *; | [A]DE19714513 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE19955523 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 28 - line 41; figure 4 *; | [A]WO03048627 (US ENVIRONMENT [US]) [A] 1,6 * paragraphs [0013] , [0023] , [0027] , [0028] , [0038]; figures 2,5 * |