EP1617133 - Light emitting diode disc optic with heat sink housing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSRAM SYLVANIA INC. 100 Endicott Street Danvers, MA 01923 / US | [2006/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coushaine, Charles 101 Birch Drive Rindge, NH 03461 / US | 02 /
Tucker, Michael 5 Morse Circle Henniker, NH 03242 / US | 03 /
Tessnow, Thomas 931 River Road Weare, NH 03281 / US | [2006/03] | Representative(s) | Lemke, Jörg-Michael Jung HML Patentanwälte Hofmarkstrasse 10 - Arnhofen 86447 Aindling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | Lemke, Jörg-Michael Jung HML Patentanwälte Hofmarkstrasse 10 - Arnhofen 86447 Aindling / DE | Application number, filing date | 05015271.9 | 14.07.2005 | [2006/03] | Priority number, date | US20040588471P | 16.07.2004 Original published format: US 588471 P | US20040939013 | 10.09.2004 Original published format: US 939013 | [2006/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1617133 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1617133 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | [2006/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1617133 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F21K7/00, F21V5/04, // F21W101/10, F21W101/12, F21W101/14, F21Y101/02 | [2006/37] | CPC: |
F21V29/70 (EP,US);
F21K9/20 (EP,US);
F21K9/69 (EP,US);
F21S41/28 (EP,US);
F21S43/14 (EP,US);
F21S43/26 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/03] | F21K7/00, F21V5/04, // F21W101:10, F21W101:12, F21W101:14, F21Y101:02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/03] | Title | German: | LED-Lampe mit einer optischen Scheibe und mit einem wärmeabführenden Gehäuse | [2006/03] | English: | Light emitting diode disc optic with heat sink housing | [2006/03] | French: | Lampe comprenant une diode électroluminescente, un disque optique et un boîtier dissipant la chaleur | [2006/03] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 02.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.09.2008 | BE | 24.09.2008 | CY | 24.09.2008 | CZ | 24.09.2008 | DK | 24.09.2008 | EE | 24.09.2008 | FI | 24.09.2008 | LT | 24.09.2008 | LV | 24.09.2008 | PL | 24.09.2008 | RO | 24.09.2008 | SI | 24.09.2008 | SK | 24.09.2008 | TR | 24.09.2008 | BG | 24.12.2008 | SE | 24.12.2008 | GR | 25.12.2008 | ES | 04.01.2009 | IS | 24.01.2009 | PT | 24.02.2009 | HU | 25.03.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
LT | 24.09.2008 | ||
LV | 24.09.2008 | ||
PL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
GR | 25.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
IS | 24.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
HU | 25.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
LT | 24.09.2008 | ||
LV | 24.09.2008 | ||
PL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
GR | 25.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
IS | 24.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
LT | 24.09.2008 | ||
LV | 24.09.2008 | ||
PL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
IS | 24.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
LT | 24.09.2008 | ||
LV | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
IS | 24.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
LT | 24.09.2008 | ||
LV | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
IS | 24.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
LT | 24.09.2008 | ||
LV | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
IS | 24.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
LT | 24.09.2008 | ||
LV | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
IS | 24.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
LT | 24.09.2008 | ||
LV | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
LT | 24.09.2008 | ||
LV | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
LT | 24.09.2008 | ||
LV | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | LT | 24.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2003002179 (ROBERTS JOHN K [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7 * paragraphs [0176] , [0177]; figures 45-47 * [Y] 3-5; | [Y]EP1298383 (OSRAM SYLVANIA INC [US]) [Y] 3,5* paragraph [0017]; figure 6 *; | [Y]US2004037087 (DESAI DEVAL M [US]) [Y] 3,4 * paragraph [0033]; figures 6,7 * |