EP1621212 - Formulations comprising antisense nucleotides to connexins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coda Therapeutics, Inc. 10505 Sorrento Valley Road, Suite 395 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2011/32] |
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states Becker, David, Dr. 19 Lapwing Way, Abbots Langley Hertfordshire, WD5 0GG / GB | ||
For all designated states Green, Colin R., Dr. 3/4 Cresent Road Epsom, Auckland / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Becker David. Dr 19 Lapwing Way Abbots Langley Hertfordshire WD5 0GG / GB | 02 /
Green Colin R. Dr 3/4 Cresent Road Epsom Auckland / NZ | [2011/32] |
Former [2006/05] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Duckworth, Timothy John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/46] | Duckworth, Timothy John J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/05] | Duckworth, Timothy John J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05016736.0 | 27.01.2000 | [2006/05] | Priority number, date | NZ19990333928 | 27.01.1999 Original published format: NZ 33392899 | NZ19990500190 | 07.10.1999 Original published format: NZ 50019099 | [2006/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1621212 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1621212 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K48/00, A61K31/70, C12N15/11, A61P17/02 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
C07H21/04 (US);
A61K31/711 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/12 (EP);
A61P17/16 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N15/1138 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2006/05] | Title | German: | Formulierungen enthaltend Antisense Nukleotide spezifisch für Connexine | [2006/05] | English: | Formulations comprising antisense nucleotides to connexins | [2006/05] | French: | Formulation comprenant des nucléotides antisens contre les connexines | [2006/05] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/37] | 30.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.10.2010 | 04.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 20.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00901236.0 / EP1146908 | Divisional application(s) | EP10013180.4 / EP2314321 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000901236) is 17.01.2003 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/43] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 20.06.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 20.06.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.07.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.11.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 06.11.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.11.2008 | Decision despatched | 20.06.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 20.06.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.07.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9824797 (DYAD PHARMACEUTICAL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-52 * see claims 1-22; abstract; page 3, lines 4-18; example 5 (pages 18-19) *; | [XY] - RUCH R J ET AL, "Inhibition of gap junctional intercellular communication and enhancement of growth in BALB/c 3T3 cells treated with connexin43 antisense oligonucleotides.", MOLECULAR CARCINOGENESIS, (1995 DEC) 14 (4) 269-74., (1995), XP000909565 [X] 1,3,5,6,11,13,15,17,20,24-26,28-30,32,37,38 * see the abstract; page 270 (section "Treatment of cells with ODN' s); page 273, last paragraph * [Y] 1-52 | [XY] - BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, XP002138806 [X] 1,3,5,6,11,13,15,17,20,24-26,28-30,32,37,38 * abstract * [Y] 1-52 | [XY] - BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, XP002138807 [X] 1,3,5,6,11,13,15,17,20,24-26,28-30,32,37,38 * abstract * [Y] 1-52 | [XY] - DAVIS L M ET AL, "MODULATION OF CONNEXIN43 EXPRESSION: EFFECTS ON CELLULAR COUPLING", JOURNAL OF CARDIOVASCULAR ELECTROPHYSIOLOGY, FUTURA PUBLISHING CO., ARMONK, NY, US, (1995), vol. 6, no. 2, ISSN 1045-3873, pages 103 - 114, XP000909568 [X] 1,3,5,6,11,13,15,17,20,24-28,30,32,37,38 * abstract * * page 104, column R, paragraph 3 * *Discussion* [Y] 1-52 | [Y] - ROZENTAL R ET AL, "STABLE TRANSFECTION WITH CONNEXIN43 INHBITS NEURONAL DIFFERENTIATION OF PC12 CELLS", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACTS, SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE, US, (19971025), vol. 23, no. 1-3, ISSN 0190-5295, page 22, XP009006429 [Y] 1-52 * the whole document * | [A] - GOLIGER, JEFFREY A. ET AL, "Wounding alters epidermal connexin expression and gap junction-mediated intercellular communication", MOL. BIOL. CELL (1995), 6(11), 1491-501, (1995), XP000909594 [A] 1-52 * see the asbstract * | [PX] - BECKER D L ET AL, "Connexin alpha1 and cell proliferation in the developing chick retina", EXPERIMENTAL NEUROLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199904), vol. 156, no. 2, ISSN 0014-4886, pages 326 - 332, XP002347187 [PX] 1-52 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/exnr.1999.7027 | [T] - GREEN C R ET AL, "Spatiotemporal Depletion of connexins Using Antisense Oligonucleotides", METHODS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, HUMANA PRESS INC., CLIFTON, NJ, US, (2001), vol. 154, pages 175 - 185, XP008053224 [T] 1-52 * the whole document * | [T] - FRANTSEVA M V ET AL, "Ischemia-induced brain damage depends on specific gap-junctional coupling", JOURNAL OF CEREBRAL BLOOD FLOW AND METABOLISM, RAVEN PRESS, LTD., NEW YORK, NY, US, (200204), vol. 22, no. 4, ISSN 0271-678X, pages 453 - 462, XP008053227 [T] 1-52 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00004647-200204000-00009 | [ ] - MOORE ET AL., "Selective block of gap junction channel expression with connexin-specific antisense oligodeoxynucleotides", AM J PHYSIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 265, no. 1, pages C1371 - C1388, XP000909522 [ ] * table 1 * | [ ] - GRAZUL-BILSKA ET AL., "Transfection of bovine luteal cells with gap junctional protein connexin 43 (Cx43) antisense oligonucleotide affects progesterone secretion", BIOLOGY REPRODUCTION, (1998), vol. 58, no. Supp 1, page 78, XP000909989 |