|
05.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.07.2016 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
27.06.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.03.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
30.03.2016 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.03.2016 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.2015 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2015 |
F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2015 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.07.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2015 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.07.2015 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.07.2015 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2015 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.07.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.07.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.06.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.04.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
7 |
|
20.02.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2014 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.03.2012 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2011 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
22.03.2011 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2011 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
14.03.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
26 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
26 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.01.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
14 |
|
20.09.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
19 |
|
20.09.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
20.09.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.09.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
20.09.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
16.09.2010 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.09.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.05.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.04.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.03.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.03.2010 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.03.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2009 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.07.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.03.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
94 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
94 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
113 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
09.04.2008 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.03.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
13.07.2007 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.07.2007 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2007 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2007 |
Note on telephone consultation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2007 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2007 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2006 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.12.2006 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
02.01.2006 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2005 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Invitation to pay the shortfall after fee increase |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2005 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2005 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.09.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
01.09.2005 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2005 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
01.09.2005 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.07.2001 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
45 |