|
28.06.2017 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2016 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.07.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.03.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
59 |
|
21.03.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
59 |
|
22.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
20.01.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.09.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
8 |
|
09.09.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.09.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
09.09.2015 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.07.2015 |
F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.07.2015 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.07.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2012 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2012 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.08.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2010 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.03.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.03.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
14.01.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.04.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.04.2009 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.06.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.06.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2007 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2007 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2007 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.08.2007 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
22.05.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
22.05.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.05.2007 |
Communication concerning non paid of designation fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2006 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2006 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2006 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2006 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
25.08.2006 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2005 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2005 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2005 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2005 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
03.09.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
03.09.2005 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2005 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
03.09.2005 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.05.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
68 |