EP1672450 - Method for determining a possible collision between at least two objects moving towards each other [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Postfach 12 60 83292 Traunreut / DE | [2006/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haunerdinger, Josef Am Türlberg 6 83377 Vachendorf / DE | [2006/25] | Application number, filing date | 05020642.4 | 22.09.2005 | [2006/25] | Priority number, date | DE20041062163 | 20.12.2004 Original published format: DE102004062163 | [2006/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1672450 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1672450 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/4061, B25J9/16 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
G05B19/4061 (EP,US);
G05B2219/49145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Ermittlung einer möglichen Kollision mindestens zweier zueinander beweglicher Objekte | [2006/25] | English: | Method for determining a possible collision between at least two objects moving towards each other | [2006/25] | French: | Procédé de calcul d'une collision potentielle entre au moins deux objets se déplaçant l'un vers l'autre | [2006/25] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/06] | 18.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.01.2008 | CZ | 23.01.2008 | DK | 23.01.2008 | EE | 23.01.2008 | FI | 23.01.2008 | IE | 23.01.2008 | LT | 23.01.2008 | LV | 23.01.2008 | NL | 23.01.2008 | PL | 23.01.2008 | RO | 23.01.2008 | SI | 23.01.2008 | SK | 23.01.2008 | TR | 23.01.2008 | BG | 23.04.2008 | SE | 23.04.2008 | GR | 24.04.2008 | IS | 23.05.2008 | PT | 23.06.2008 | HU | 24.07.2008 | AT | 22.09.2008 | LU | 22.09.2008 | BE | 30.09.2008 | MC | 30.09.2008 | [2010/51] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 23.01.2008 | |
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
TR | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
HU | 24.07.2008 | ||
AT | 22.09.2008 | ||
LU | 22.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CY | 23.01.2008 | |
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
HU | 24.07.2008 | ||
AT | 22.09.2008 | ||
LU | 22.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 23.01.2008 | |
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
AT | 22.09.2008 | ||
LU | 22.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/51] | CY | 23.01.2008 | |
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
AT | 22.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/45] | CY | 23.01.2008 | |
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/32] | CZ | 23.01.2008 | |
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 23.01.2008 | |
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | CZ | 23.01.2008 | |
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 23.01.2008 | |
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | CZ | 23.01.2008 | |
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 23.01.2008 | |
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 23.01.2008 | |
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 23.01.2008 | |
LV | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | FI | 23.01.2008 | |
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 23.01.2008 | |
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 23.01.2008 | |
IS | 23.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4578757 (STARK JOHAN S H [SE]) [A] 1-16 * column 1, line 8 - line 16 * * column 3, line 6 - line 18 * * column 5, line 60 - line 63 * * figures 1-6 *; | [DA]EP0268317 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al) [DA] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A]EP0412619 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-16 * column 2, line 45 - column 12, line 3 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0426249 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-16 * column 1, line 31 - line 47 * * column 2, line 5 - line 45 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5056031 (NAKANO MASARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 1, line 47 - line 60 * * column 2, line 11 - line 23 * * column 2, line 53 - line 61 * * column 3, line 30 - line 52 * * column 4, line 3 - line 40 * * claims 1-16 * * figures 1-12 * |