blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1650431

EP1650431 - Device for a wind generator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  18.10.2019
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 20.11.2019  [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Senvion GmbH
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
[2019/47]
Former [2015/36]For all designated states
Senvion GmbH
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
Senvion SE
Überseering 10 (Oval Office)
22297 Hamburg / DE
Former [2012/52]For all designated states
REpower Systems SE
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Former [2012/25]For all designated states
REpower Systems SE
Alsterkrugchaussee 378
22335 Hamburg / DE
Former [2006/17]For all designated states
Repower Systems AG
Alsterkrugchaussee 378
22335 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Altemark, Jens
Kronbwerker Moor 33
24768 Rendsburg / DE
02 / Bolln, Sönke
Landvogt-Joh.-Straße 89
25746 Heide / DE
 [2006/17]
Representative(s)Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB
Zweibrückenstraße 5-7
80331 München / DE
[2019/47]
Former [2013/11]Hausfeld, Norbert, et al
Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR
Beselerstraße 6
22607 Hamburg / DE
Former [2013/08]Wetzel, Philipp, et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Beselerstraße 6
22607 Hamburg / DE
Former [2012/36]Hausfeld, Norbert
Schaefer Emmel Hausfeld Patentanwälte Krohnstieg 43
22415 Hamburg / DE
Former [2006/17]Hausfeld, Norbert
Patentanwälte Schaefer Emmel Hausfeld Gehölzweg 20
D-22043 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date05021796.706.10.2005
[2006/17]
Priority number, dateDE2004105105419.10.2004         Original published format: DE102004051054
[2006/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1650431
Date:26.04.2006
Language:DE
[2006/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1650431
Date:10.06.2009
[2009/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1650431
Date:05.09.2012
Language:DE
[2012/36]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1650431
Date:20.11.2019
Language:DE
[2019/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.05.2009
ClassificationIPC:F03D7/02, F03D11/00
[2006/17]
CPC:
F03D7/0248 (EP); F03D17/00 (EP,US); F03D80/00 (EP);
F16D66/00 (EP); F05B2260/902 (EP); F16D2055/0091 (EP);
F16D2066/001 (EP); F16D2066/005 (EP); F16D2121/005 (EP);
F16D2121/02 (EP); F16D2121/24 (EP); Y02E10/72 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB [2019/47]
Former [2010/07]DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB 
Former [2006/17]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung für eine Windenergieanlage[2006/17]
English:Device for a wind generator[2006/17]
French:Dispositif destiné à une éolienne[2006/17]
Examination procedure12.08.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/39]
11.12.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
18.01.2010Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
31.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2012Fee for grant paid
24.07.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP12005483.8  / EP2602482
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.05.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.06.2013  19.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ENERCON GmbH
Dreekamp 5
26605 Aurich / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Am Kaffee-Quartier 3
28217 Bremen / DE
 [2015/03]
Former [2014/27]
Opponent(s)01  05.06.2013  19.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ENERCON GmbH
Dreekamp 5
26605 Aurich / DE
Opponent's representative
Veenhuis, Holger
Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Am Kaffee-Quartier 3
DE-28217 Bremen / DE
Former [2013/28]
Opponent(s)01  05.06.2013   
ENERCON GmbH
Dreekamp 5
26605 Aurich / DE
Opponent's representative
Veenhuis, Holger
Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
12.07.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.11.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
17.11.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.05.2019Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.06.2019Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
24.07.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
15.10.2019Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition27.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0201/16
24.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
27.05.2019Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
27.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0201/16
27.01.2016Statement of grounds filed
27.05.2019Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
27.05.2019Date of oral proceedings
12.06.2019Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
28.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0419207  (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [X] 1-18 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 10 *;
 [X]DE4231107  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-18 * abstract *;
 [X]EP0777063  (MELLADO TOMAS ISMAEL [ES], et al) [X] 1-18 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 47 * * column 4, line 12 - line 25 *;
 [X]US6276495  (KRAMER DENNIS A [US]) [X] 1-18 * column 1, line 22 - line 31 * * column 1, line 54 - line 65 *;
 [A]WO0186141  (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [A] 1-18* page 2, paragraph 4 - page 3, paragraph 1 *;
 [X]US2003111306  (WATANABE YASUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-18 * abstract *
OppositionUS3674114
 US3931727
 DE2741449
 JPS62200041
 EP0347654
 DE3829949
 EP0777063
 WO9904179
 WO0186141
 US2003111306
 DE10307929
    - HAU; ERICH, Windkraftanlagen: Grundlagen, Technik, Einsatz, Wirtschaftlichkeit. 3. Auflage, (2003), XP002163958
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.