EP1658891 - Process regulating the amount of particles circulating in a cyclone reactor system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/21] | Fluidized bed reactor with a cyclonic separator | ||
[2007/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2008 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5401 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/21] | For all designated states Alstom Technology Ltd Brown-Boveri-Str. 7/699/5 5401 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muschelknautz, Ulrich, Dr. Augustenstrasse 81 70178 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Röper, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing. Auf der Leck 8 50126 Bergheim / DE | [2006/21] | Application number, filing date | 05021919.5 | 07.10.2005 | [2006/21] | Priority number, date | DE20041051477 | 22.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004051477 | [2006/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1658891 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1658891 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/18 | [2006/21] | CPC: |
B01J8/1863 (EP,US);
B01J8/0055 (EP,US);
B01J8/388 (EP,US);
B04C5/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, PL, TR [2007/05] |
Former [2006/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Regulierung der Feststoffumlaufmenge eines zirkulierenden Wirbelschichtreaktorsystems | [2007/24] | English: | Process regulating the amount of particles circulating in a cyclone reactor system | [2007/24] | French: | Procédé pour régler le taux des particules circulant dans un appareil comprenant un cyclone et un réacteur | [2007/24] |
Former [2006/21] | Wirbelschichtreaktor mit einem Zyklonabscheider | ||
Former [2006/21] | Fluidized bed reactor with a cyclonic separator | ||
Former [2006/21] | Réacteur à lit fluidisé avec un séparateur cyclonique | Examination procedure | 22.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 24.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3199270 (KARL-HEINZ OEHLRICH) [X] 1-18 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 10; figures 1,5,6 * * column 5, line 64 - line 73 * * column 8, line 2 - line 10; claim 7 *; | [X]FR2290244 (WIKDAHL NILS [SE]) [X] 1-18 * page 4, line 39 - page 5, line 11; example 2 *; | [X]US5426868 (YAMADA NAOTAKE [JP], et al) [X] 1-18* column 4, line 36 - line 63; figures 1,2; claims 1-7 *; | [X]US5634516 (MYOEHAENEN KARI [FI], et al) [X] 1-18 * column 1, line 9 - line 22; figure 2 * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 25 *; | [X]WO9853908 (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-18 * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 4 * * page 3, line 13 - page 4, line 16 * * page 5, line 20 - line 24 * |