EP1647311 - Manner of attaching component elements to filtration material such as may be utilized in respiratory masks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2006/16] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Curran, Desmond T. P.O.Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
Williams, Elfe I. P.O.Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2006/16] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/16] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05024551.3 | 24.03.2000 | [2006/16] | Priority number, date | US19990420671 | 19.10.1999 Original published format: US 420671 | [2006/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1647311 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1647311 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A62B23/02, B01D46/10 | [2006/16] | CPC: |
A62B23/025 (EP,KR,US);
A62B18/10 (EP,KR,US);
A62B23/02 (EP,KR,US);
A62B9/04 (EP,KR,US);
B01D46/0001 (EP,KR,US);
B01D46/0005 (EP,KR,US);
B01D46/10 (EP,KR,US);
B01D46/12 (EP,KR,US);
B01D46/4272 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/0415 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2259/4148 (EP,US);
B01D2259/4541 (EP,US);
B01D2265/021 (EP,US);
B01D2265/04 (EP,US);
B01D2275/10 (EP,US);
B01D2279/55 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2006/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Anbringen von Komponenten an Filtermaterial, das in Atemschutzmasken verwendet werden kann | [2006/16] | English: | Manner of attaching component elements to filtration material such as may be utilized in respiratory masks | [2006/16] | French: | Manière de fixer des éléments a un matériaux filtrant tels qu'ils peuvent l'être dans des masques respiratoires | [2006/16] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/27] | 01.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.10.2009 | 08.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00918425.0 / EP1224011 | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.12.2009 | BE | 09.12.2009 | CY | 09.12.2009 | DK | 09.12.2009 | FI | 09.12.2009 | NL | 09.12.2009 | SE | 09.12.2009 | GR | 10.03.2010 | ES | 20.03.2010 | IE | 24.03.2010 | LU | 24.03.2010 | CH | 31.03.2010 | LI | 31.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | PT | 09.04.2010 | [2012/43] |
Former [2011/11] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 09.12.2009 | |
SE | 09.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2341566 (RANDOLPH MONRO) [Y] 1-4,7,12-19,21,22,24-27 * the whole document *; | [X]US3003499 (WALTER TIMM, et al) [X] 24-26 * the whole document *; | [A]US5199635 (ABRAMS ROBERT S [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * abstract * * column 3, line 19 - line 32 * * column 4, line 43 - line 46 * * column 5, line 67 - column 6, line 28 * * column 7, line 26 - line 39 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5348182 (LUCH DANIEL [US]) [A] 1-27* abstract *; | [Y]WO9924119 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [Y] 1-4,7,12-19,21,22,24-27 * the whole document * |