EP1790242 - Laminated collar [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arc'Teryx Equipment Inc. 2770 Bentall Street Vancouver British Columbia V5M 4H4 / CA | [2007/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blenkarn, Mike 1864 Beaulynn Place North Vancouver BC V7J 2T1 / CA | [2007/22] | Representative(s) | Putet, Gilles, et al Salomon S.A.S D.J.P.I. 74996 Annecy Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | Putet, Gilles, et al Salomon S.A., Direction Juridique et Propriété Industrielle 74996 Annecy Cedex 9 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05025939.9 | 29.11.2005 | [2007/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1790242 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1790242 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A41B3/10, A41D27/18 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
A41D27/18 (EP,US);
A41B3/10 (EP,US);
A41D2200/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/22] | Title | German: | Mehrschichtiger Kragen | [2007/22] | English: | Laminated collar | [2007/22] | French: | Col multicouche | [2007/22] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2005 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 21.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.06.2010 | BE | 30.06.2010 | CY | 30.06.2010 | CZ | 30.06.2010 | DK | 30.06.2010 | EE | 30.06.2010 | FI | 30.06.2010 | IT | 30.06.2010 | LT | 30.06.2010 | LV | 30.06.2010 | NL | 30.06.2010 | PL | 30.06.2010 | RO | 30.06.2010 | SE | 30.06.2010 | SI | 30.06.2010 | SK | 30.06.2010 | TR | 30.06.2010 | BG | 30.09.2010 | GR | 01.10.2010 | ES | 11.10.2010 | IS | 30.10.2010 | PT | 02.11.2010 | IE | 29.11.2010 | LU | 29.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | HU | 01.01.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
TR | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
IE | 29.11.2010 | ||
LU | 29.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
HU | 01.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
IE | 29.11.2010 | ||
LU | 29.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
HU | 01.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
IE | 29.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
HU | 01.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
IE | 29.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
IE | 29.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR1333171 (R GRAVEREAUX ETS) [X] 1 * page 1, column 1, paragraphs 3,4; figures 2,4; claim 1 * [Y] 2-4; | [A]US3333280 (HYNEK WALTER J, et al) [A] 1,2 * column 6, line 54 - column 7, line 3; figures 2,2a *; | [A]US6070542 (WONG JOHN [CA]) [A] 1,2* column 4, lines 18-20,41-45 *; | [Y]DE20218185U (POLO EXPRESSVERSAND GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 2-4 * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 8, paragraph 1; figures 3a,3b * | by applicant | US6654963 |