|
20.10.2016 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2016 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2016 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2016 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
19.08.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.08.2016 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.08.2016 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.06.2016 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.06.2016 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.06.2016 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.06.2016 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.06.2016 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.06.2016 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2016 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.02.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
29.02.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.02.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.02.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
11 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Request for a change of address - opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
54 |
|
07.09.2015 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.08.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.08.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.08.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.08.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.07.2013 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.08.2012 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
06.07.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.07.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.07.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2012 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2012 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2012 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.06.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.03.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.03.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.02.2012 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Annex |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.04.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.04.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.04.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.04.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.01.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
26.08.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.08.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.08.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
28.07.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
28.07.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.07.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.07.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2008 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2008 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.02.2008 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2008 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2008 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2007 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.12.2007 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.08.2007 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2007 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.08.2007 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
20.07.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2006 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.06.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2006 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2006 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2006 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2006 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2006 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2006 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2005 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.12.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
17.12.2005 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2005 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.12.2005 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
17.12.2005 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |