blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1579829

EP1579829 - Articulated rod with assisted regulation for an orthopedic brace [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2007
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, HU, LU, TR
published on 04.11.2009  [2009/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Orthoschärer & Co. di Paolo Rossi & Co.
Rotzbergstrasse 7
6362 Stansstad (NW) / CH
[2005/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Rossi Paolo
Stanserstrasse 23
6362 Stansstad / CH
02 / Caporello Paolo
Via Monte Cimone 13
31044 Montebelluna / IT
 [2005/39]
Representative(s)Coppo, Alessandro
Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A.
Via Boronuovo 10
20121 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2005/39]Coppo, Alessandro
Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A., Via Borgonuovo, 10
20121 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date05075680.818.03.2005
[2005/39]
Priority number, dateIT2004MI0057424.03.2004         Original published format: IT MI20040574
[2005/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1579829
Date:28.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1579829
Date:13.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.07.2005
ClassificationIPC:A61F5/01
[2005/39]
CPC:
A61F5/0125 (EP,US); A61F5/0193 (EP,US); A61F2005/0134 (EP,US);
A61F2005/0158 (EP,US); A61F2005/0167 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/39]
TitleGerman:Gelenkstange mit unterstützter Einstellung für eine Gelenkorthese[2005/39]
English:Articulated rod with assisted regulation for an orthopedic brace[2005/39]
French:Tige articulée avec régularisation assistée pour une attelle orthopédique[2005/39]
Examination procedure15.02.2006Examination requested  [2006/15]
28.04.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2006Fee for grant paid
24.07.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.06.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.09.2006
BE13.09.2006
CH13.09.2006
CY13.09.2006
CZ13.09.2006
EE13.09.2006
FI13.09.2006
FR13.09.2006
IT13.09.2006
LI13.09.2006
LT13.09.2006
NL13.09.2006
PL13.09.2006
RO13.09.2006
SI13.09.2006
SK13.09.2006
TR13.09.2006
BG13.12.2006
DK13.12.2006
SE13.12.2006
DE14.12.2006
GR14.12.2006
ES24.12.2006
IS13.01.2007
PT26.02.2007
HU14.03.2007
LU18.03.2007
IE19.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
[2009/45]
Former [2008/52]AT13.09.2006
BE13.09.2006
CH13.09.2006
CZ13.09.2006
EE13.09.2006
FI13.09.2006
FR13.09.2006
IT13.09.2006
LI13.09.2006
LT13.09.2006
NL13.09.2006
PL13.09.2006
RO13.09.2006
SI13.09.2006
SK13.09.2006
BG13.12.2006
DK13.12.2006
SE13.12.2006
DE14.12.2006
GR14.12.2006
ES24.12.2006
IS13.01.2007
PT26.02.2007
IE19.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
Former [2008/38]AT13.09.2006
BE13.09.2006
CH13.09.2006
CZ13.09.2006
EE13.09.2006
FI13.09.2006
IT13.09.2006
LI13.09.2006
LT13.09.2006
NL13.09.2006
PL13.09.2006
RO13.09.2006
SI13.09.2006
SK13.09.2006
BG13.12.2006
DK13.12.2006
SE13.12.2006
DE14.12.2006
GR14.12.2006
ES24.12.2006
IS13.01.2007
PT26.02.2007
IE19.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
FR18.05.2007
Former [2008/23]AT13.09.2006
BE13.09.2006
CH13.09.2006
CZ13.09.2006
FI13.09.2006
IT13.09.2006
LI13.09.2006
LT13.09.2006
NL13.09.2006
PL13.09.2006
RO13.09.2006
SI13.09.2006
SK13.09.2006
BG13.12.2006
DK13.12.2006
SE13.12.2006
DE14.12.2006
GR14.12.2006
ES24.12.2006
IS13.01.2007
PT26.02.2007
IE19.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
FR18.05.2007
Former [2008/21]AT13.09.2006
BE13.09.2006
CH13.09.2006
CZ13.09.2006
FI13.09.2006
IT13.09.2006
LI13.09.2006
LT13.09.2006
NL13.09.2006
PL13.09.2006
RO13.09.2006
SI13.09.2006
SK13.09.2006
BG13.12.2006
DK13.12.2006
SE13.12.2006
DE14.12.2006
GR14.12.2006
ES24.12.2006
IS13.01.2007
PT26.02.2007
IE19.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
Former [2008/12]AT13.09.2006
BE13.09.2006
CH13.09.2006
CZ13.09.2006
FI13.09.2006
IT13.09.2006
LI13.09.2006
LT13.09.2006
NL13.09.2006
PL13.09.2006
RO13.09.2006
SI13.09.2006
SK13.09.2006
BG13.12.2006
DK13.12.2006
SE13.12.2006
DE14.12.2006
ES24.12.2006
IS13.01.2007
PT26.02.2007
IE19.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
Former [2007/44]AT13.09.2006
BE13.09.2006
CH13.09.2006
CZ13.09.2006
FI13.09.2006
IT13.09.2006
LI13.09.2006
LT13.09.2006
NL13.09.2006
PL13.09.2006
RO13.09.2006
SI13.09.2006
SK13.09.2006
BG13.12.2006
DK13.12.2006
SE13.12.2006
DE14.12.2006
ES24.12.2006
IS13.01.2007
PT26.02.2007
Former [2007/29]AT13.09.2006
BE13.09.2006
CH13.09.2006
CZ13.09.2006
FI13.09.2006
LI13.09.2006
LT13.09.2006
NL13.09.2006
PL13.09.2006
SI13.09.2006
SK13.09.2006
BG13.12.2006
SE13.12.2006
ES24.12.2006
IS13.01.2007
PT26.02.2007
Former [2007/22]CH13.09.2006
CZ13.09.2006
FI13.09.2006
LI13.09.2006
NL13.09.2006
PL13.09.2006
SI13.09.2006
BG13.12.2006
SE13.12.2006
ES24.12.2006
IS13.01.2007
Former [2007/21]CH13.09.2006
FI13.09.2006
LI13.09.2006
NL13.09.2006
PL13.09.2006
SI13.09.2006
BG13.12.2006
SE13.12.2006
ES24.12.2006
IS13.01.2007
Former [2007/15]CH13.09.2006
FI13.09.2006
LI13.09.2006
PL13.09.2006
SI13.09.2006
BG13.12.2006
SE13.12.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]US6039709  (BZOCH JAN J [US]) [A] 1,4,5,14,15 * column 2, line 13 - column 4, line 35; figures 1,4 *;
 [A]US6203511  (JOHNSON JAMES A [US], et al) [A] 1,2,19-22 * column 3, line 37 - column 7, line 11; figures 1-3,9,10 *;
 [A]US2003199798  (GILMOUR ROBERT FARRER [NZ]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0041]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2004015112  (SALUTTERBACK E GERALD [US], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.