|
15.02.2018 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2018 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2018 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Clean copy of claims in the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Clean copy of description pages in the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
35 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.02.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.08.2017 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2017 |
OPPODREX with handwritten amendments |
Opposition |
22 |
|
11.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.05.2017 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2017 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
22 |
|
20.04.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2017 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.02.2017 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2017 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2017 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2017 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
16 |
|
13.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
03.02.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
24.10.2016 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
24.10.2016 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.07.2016 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2016 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.07.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.07.2016 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.02.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.02.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.02.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
18.02.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
22 |
|
19.11.2012 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
11.09.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.08.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.04.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2011 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.11.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2011 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.07.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.07.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.07.2011 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.03.2011 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.01.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.11.2010 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.11.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
19.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
19.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
19.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
19.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
19.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
28.01.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.12.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.09.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.05.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.05.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2006 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2006 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.07.2006 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.04.2006 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2006 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2006 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
16.03.2006 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
10.03.2006 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2006 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2005 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.11.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
14.11.2005 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2005 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
14.11.2005 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
19 |