|
15.05.2017 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.2017 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2017 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2017 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2017 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2017 |
Communication: patent lapsed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2017 |
Communication: patent lapsed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.01.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Decision revoking the European Patent (patent proprietor) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Decision revoking the European patent (opponent) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Communication concerning surcharge and failure to observe time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2016 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2016 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2016 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.05.2016 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
26 |
|
26.04.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2016 |
F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.01.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.10.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.10.2015 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
02.10.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2015 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2015 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2015 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.02.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.09.2014 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2014 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.06.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.01.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2013 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
62 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
79 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
62 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
52 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
10 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
52 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
41 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
52 |
|
06.06.2013 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2013 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2013 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
50 |
|
21.01.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.01.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.01.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.01.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
50 |
|
14.01.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
26.11.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
31.07.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
12 |
|
31.07.2012 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
38 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
37 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
14.06.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
32 |
|
09.03.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
37 |
|
31.10.2011 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.04.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.04.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
37 |
|
28.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
28.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
28.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
50 |
|
28.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
28.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
28.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
48 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.08.2010 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2010 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2010 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2010 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.10.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2008 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2008 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.02.2008 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.09.2007 |
Communication of expected date of establishment of search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2007 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2006 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2005 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.11.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
30.11.2005 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2005 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2005 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
30.11.2005 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |