blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1671536

EP1671536 - Double-type kalanchoe interspecific hybrids [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.11.2018
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.06.2024New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Knud Jepsen A/S
Skanderborgvej 193
8382 Hinnerup / DK
[2015/43]
Former [2006/25]For all designated states
Knud Jepsen A/S
Damsbrovej 53 Norring
8382 Hinnerup / DK
Inventor(s)01 / Jepsen, Knud
Bogfinkevej 28
8382 Hinnerup / DK
02 / Christensen, Ellen
Trigevej 7B
Soften
8382 Hinnerup / DK
 [2015/43]
Former [2006/25]01 / Jepsen, Knud
Bogfinkevej 28
8382 Hinnerup / DK
02 / Christensen, Ellen
Trigevej 7B, Soften
8382 Hinnerup / DK
Representative(s)Wittop Koning, Tom Hugo
Biopatents IP Consultancy
Dagpauwooglaan 1
5691NW Son en Breugel / NL
[N/P]
Former [2013/44]Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V.
P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
Former [2013/41]Abbas, Gabor, et al
Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V.
P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
Former [2006/25]Van kan, Johan Joseph Hubert, et al
Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date05077885.115.12.2005
[2006/25]
Priority number, dateUS2004001161815.12.2004         Original published format: US 11618
US2005008107116.03.2005         Original published format: US 81071
[2006/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1671536
Date:21.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1671536
Date:21.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.04.2006
ClassificationIPC:A01H5/02
[2006/25]
CPC:
A01H6/32 (EP,US); A01H5/02 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/43]
Former [2006/25]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Interspezifische Doppeltyp-Kalanchoe Hybride[2006/25]
English:Double-type kalanchoe interspecific hybrids[2006/25]
French:Hybrids interspécifiques de kalanchoe de type double[2006/25]
Examination procedure08.12.2006Examination requested  [2007/04]
03.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.11.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.03.2011Observations by third parties
14.02.2012Observations by third parties
26.06.2013Date of oral proceedings
21.11.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
20.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.08.2015Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
04.08.2015Fee for grant paid
04.08.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.09.2015Information about intention to grant a patent
15.09.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.05.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.07.2016  16.11.2023  WITHDRAWN
Slijkerman Breeding B.V./KP Holland Licensing B.V. /V.O.F. Topcolor Breeding/ AB Breeding B.V.
Veenhuizerweg 40a/Lange Broekweg 84/
Parelduiker 21/Achterweg 58-A
1704 DP Heerhugowaard/2671 DW Naaldwijk
2681 VJ Monster/1424 PR De Kwakel/NL / NL
Opponent's representative
van Someren, Petronella F. H. M.
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 [2023/52]
Former [2016/34]
Opponent(s)01  19.07.2016    ADMISSIBLE
Slijkerman Breeding B.V./KP Holland Licensing B.V. /V.O.F. Topcolor Breeding/ AB Breeding B.V.
Veenhuizerweg 40a/Lange Broekweg 84/
Parelduiker 21/Achterweg 58-A
1704 DP Heerhugowaard/2671 DW Naaldwijk
2681 VJ Monster/1424 PR De Kwakel/NL / NL
Opponent's representative
van Someren, Petronella F. H. M.
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
29.08.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.01.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.07.2018Date of oral proceedings
12.11.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.11.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
07.03.2024Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.03.2024
12.03.2024Date of oral proceedings
22.05.2024Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
22.05.2024Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
06.06.2024Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
Appeal following opposition11.01.2019Appeal received No.  T0112/19
11.03.2019Statement of grounds filed
29.01.2021Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2021/05]
13.04.2021Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2021/16]
30.03.2022Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
29.04.2022Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
16.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
23.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
12.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.12.2005
AT21.10.2015
BE21.10.2015
BG21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
IE15.12.2015
LU15.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
GB15.12.2018
IT15.12.2018
ES16.12.2018
FR31.12.2018
DK31.12.2022
DE01.07.2023
[2024/10]
Former [2023/48]HU15.12.2005
AT21.10.2015
BE21.10.2015
BG21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
IE15.12.2015
LU15.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
GB15.12.2018
IT15.12.2018
ES16.12.2018
FR31.12.2018
DE01.07.2023
Former [2020/24]HU15.12.2005
AT21.10.2015
BE21.10.2015
BG21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
IE15.12.2015
LU15.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
GB15.12.2018
IT15.12.2018
ES16.12.2018
FR31.12.2018
Former [2020/03]HU15.12.2005
AT21.10.2015
BE21.10.2015
BG21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
IE15.12.2015
LU15.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
GB15.12.2018
IT15.12.2018
FR31.12.2018
Former [2019/49]HU15.12.2005
AT21.10.2015
BE21.10.2015
BG21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
IE15.12.2015
LU15.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
IT15.12.2018
FR31.12.2018
Former [2019/46]HU15.12.2005
AT21.10.2015
BE21.10.2015
BG21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
IE15.12.2015
LU15.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
IT15.12.2018
Former [2017/39]HU15.12.2005
AT21.10.2015
BE21.10.2015
BG21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
IE15.12.2015
LU15.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2017/03]AT21.10.2015
BE21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
IE15.12.2015
LU15.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/49]AT21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
IE15.12.2015
LU15.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/46]AT21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
IE15.12.2015
LU15.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/45]AT21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
IE15.12.2015
LU15.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/36]AT21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
LU15.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/34]AT21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
LU15.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/33]AT21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
BE31.12.2015
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/25]AT21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
BE31.12.2015
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/24]AT21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
BE31.12.2015
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/23]LT21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
IS21.02.2016
Former [2016/22]LT21.10.2015
IS21.02.2016
Former [2016/20]LT21.10.2015
Documents cited:Search[DA]US14714P  (VLIELANDER IKE);
 [DA]US13365P  (VLIELANDER IKE);
 [DA]US12299P  (JEPSEN KNUD)
ExaminationUS14671P
    - BOOM B K ET AL, "Kalanchoe vadensis, species nova", SUCCULENTA, NEDERLANDS-BELGISCHE VERENIGING VAN LIEFHEBBERS VAN CACTUSSEN EN ANDERE VETPLANTEN, NETHERLANDS, (19640101), vol. 43, ISSN 0039-4467, pages 122 - 124, XP008104400
    - VAN OORST A ET AL, "THE ORIGIN AND CHROMOSOME NUMBERS OF CULTIVARS OF KALANCHOE-BLOSSFELDIANA VON POELLN.: THEIR HISTORY AND EVOLUTION", EUPHYTICA, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1007/BF00039195, vol. 31, no. 3, ISSN 0014-2336, (19821201), pages 573 - 584, (20041104), XP008104212

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00039195
    - KROON G.H., "A note on the origin of Kalanchoee X vadensis Boom and Zeilinga (Crassulaceae)", EUPHYTICA, (1994), vol. 76, page 125
otherUS15509P
OppositionUSPP17980P
 US2006064792P
 USPP13365P
 US10026P
 US2006212984P
    - Anonymous, "Dark Jodie", Crop Report of Canadian Food Inspection Agency, XP055300986
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.