EP1690880 - Two component polyurethane compositions, especially suitable for use in structural adhesives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sika Technology AG Zugerstrasse 50 6340 Baar / CH | [2006/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Demmig, Martin Dr. Norderquerweg 168 21037, Hamburg / DE | [2006/33] | Representative(s) | Isler, Jörg, et al c/o Sika Technology AG Intellectual Property Department Tüffenwies 16-22 Postfach 8048 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/33] | Isler, Jörg, et al c/o Sika Technology AG, Tüffenwies 16-22 8048 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 05101001.5 | 11.02.2005 | [2006/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1690880 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/32, C08G18/66, C09J175/04 | [2006/33] | CPC: |
C08G18/3215 (EP,US);
B65D11/00 (US);
C08G18/72 (US);
C09J175/04 (EP,US);
C09J5/00 (US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/33] | Title | German: | Zweikomponentige Polyurethanzusammensetzungen, insbesondere geeignet für den Einsatz als strukturelle Klebstoffe | [2006/33] | English: | Two component polyurethane compositions, especially suitable for use in structural adhesives | [2006/33] | French: | Compositions de polyuréthanes à deux composants, espécialement utile dans les adhésifs de structure | [2006/33] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/14] | 04.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/06] | 01.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.06.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3252944 (CURTIS RALPH J) [X] 1,7,8 * column 2, line 4 - line 43 * * column 4, line 6 - line 34; claims 1-4 *; | [X]EP0454446 (ARCO CHEM TECH [US]) [X] 1,7-10 * page 2, line 20 - page 4, line 41 * * page 5, line 47 - page 6, line 2; example 5; claims 1-5,12 *; | [X]EP0556758 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,7 * page 2, line 44 - page 3, line 2 * * page 3, line 50 - page 4, line 42; claims 1-5 *; | [A]US2004072952 (HUNG JU-MING [US], et al) [A] 1* paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0021]; claims 1,4,13-15 * |