EP1743920 - Thermoplastic fluoropolymer composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay Solexis S.p.A. Via Turati, 12 20121 Milano / IT | [2007/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abusleme, Julio Via Bergamo 5 21047, Saronno / IT | 02 /
Brinati, Giulio Via Oglio, 1 20139, Milano / IT | 03 /
Guarda, Pier Antonio Via XXV Aprile, 15 20020, Arese / IT | [2007/03] | Representative(s) | Jacques, Philippe Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/03] | Jacques, Philippe Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle, Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 05106411.1 | 13.07.2005 | [2007/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1743920 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08L27/12, C08L27/16, // C08L27/16, C08L71/00, C08L27/12 | [2007/03] | CPC: |
C08L27/16 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
C08L2205/03 (EP,US);
C08L27/18 (EP,US);
C08L71/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L27/16, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L27/16, C08L2666/14 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/38] |
Former [2007/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Thermoplastische Fluorpolymerzusammensetzung | [2007/03] | English: | Thermoplastic fluoropolymer composition | [2007/03] | French: | Composition thermoplastique de fluoropolymère | [2007/03] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/09] | 10.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0649438 ; | [A]EP0222408 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * example -; claim - *; | [A]EP0374803 (AUSIMONT SRL [IT]) [A] 1* example -; claim - *; | [DX]EP0816397 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]) [DX] 1-3,5-8,16 * example 3; claim - *; | [A]WO03050183 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 1,11 * page 7, line 12 - line 29; example -; claim - *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 12, Database accession no. 1994-098044, XP002359401 & JPH0649438 A 19940222 (NTN CORP) [A] 1-3,5-12,16 * abstract * | by applicant | US3624250 | US3665041 | US3810874 | US3847978 | US4016345 | US4380618 | US4513129 | US4524194 | EP0185242 | EP0186215 | US4725644 | US4739024 | US5021516 | US5182342 | EP0526216 | US5223343 | US5434229 | US5453477 | US5510435 | US5569728 | US5597880 | US6297334 | US6479591 |