|
23.01.2020 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2020 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2020 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.01.2020 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.01.2020 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2019 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.11.2019 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.11.2019 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.08.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.08.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2019 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2019 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
01.08.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2019 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.08.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2019 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.04.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Brief communication in opposition procedure - time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.04.2019 |
Brief communication in opposition procedure - time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2019 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2019 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.04.2019 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
10 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Description |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.03.2019 |
Description |
Opposition |
8 |
|
22.03.2019 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2018 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2018 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.2018 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2018 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.11.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
19.11.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Claims submitted during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Claims submitted during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.08.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2018 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.07.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2018 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.06.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.06.2018 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
11 |
|
06.06.2018 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.10.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2015 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
11.09.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.09.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
13.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.07.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.07.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
13.04.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.03.2015 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.03.2015 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
28 |
|
09.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
04.02.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2015 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2015 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.2015 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.01.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.12.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.12.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2014 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.08.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.08.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.08.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.08.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.08.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.08.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.11.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2013 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.11.2013 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2013 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2013 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2013 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.10.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2012 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.07.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.07.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
12.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
12.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
12.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
12.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
12.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
12.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
15.09.2011 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2011 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
26.01.2010 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2009 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2009 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2009 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.02.2009 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |