EP1630739 - Systems and methods for supporting custom graphical representations in reporting software [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Welcker, Brian Lee c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way 98052, Redmond / US | 02 /
Hays, Christopher Alan c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way 98052, Redmond / US | 03 /
Carlson, Jason D. c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way 98052, Redmond / US | [2006/09] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/09] | Zimmer, Franz-Josef Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05107712.1 | 23.08.2005 | [2006/09] | Priority number, date | US20040929197 | 30.08.2004 Original published format: US 929197 | [2006/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1630739 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
G06F40/106 (EP,KR,US);
G06F40/14 (KR);
G06F40/143 (EP,US);
G06F40/186 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/09] | Title | German: | Systeme und Verfahren zum Bereitstellen von kundenspezifischen graphischen Darstellungen in einer Berichterstattungssoftware | [2006/09] | English: | Systems and methods for supporting custom graphical representations in reporting software | [2006/09] | French: | Systèmes et procédés permettant le support de représentations graphiques personnalisées pour des logiciels de rapport | [2006/09] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 06.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/35] | 13.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9724680 (TELE COMMUNICATIONS INC [US]) [X] 1-33 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - page 4, line 16 ** page 8, line 10 - page 12, line 2 *; | [X]US6067525 (JOHNSON JEROME DALE [US], et al) [X] 1-33 * abstract * * column 9, lines 25-53 * * column 16, line 21 - column 18, line 16 * * column 20, line 8 - column 21, line 51 *; | [X]US6160549 (TOUMA ANDRE [US], et al) [X] 1-33 * abstract * * column 1, line 10 - column 4, line 63 * * column 9, line 10 - column 10, line 52 * * column 13, line 10 - column 14, line 27 * * column 16, line 61 - column 17, line 5 *; | [X]US6385595 (KOLLING RAY [US], et al) [X] 1-33 * abstract * * column 1, line 13 - column 6, line 39 * * column 17, line 21 - column 19, line 8 * * column 22, line 40 - column 24, line 3 *; | [X]US2002091681 (CRAS JEAN-YVES [FR], et al) [X] 1-33 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0012] * * paragraphs [0063] - [0065] * * paragraphs [0082] - [0090] * * paragraph [0162] * |