|
07.10.2015 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2014 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2014 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
04.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
16.05.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
10 |
|
01.04.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
18 |
|
14.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.02.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.12.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.12.2013 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2012 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2010 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.02.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
07.12.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.12.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Decision to refuse according to the state of the file |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2009 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the EP procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2009 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.10.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the EP procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2009 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the EP procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the EP procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2008 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the EP procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.11.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.09.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.06.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2007 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2006 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2006 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.2006 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2006 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.01.2006 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2005 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2005 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.10.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
12.10.2005 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2005 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.10.2005 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |