|
16.06.2016 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2016 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.06.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
03.06.2016 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2016 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
24 |
|
19.08.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.06.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2015 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
22 |
|
21.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.04.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.04.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.04.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.04.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.04.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.04.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.04.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.04.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.04.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
27.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.03.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.03.2015 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
12 |
|
03.03.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2015 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
27.01.2012 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2011 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
30 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
50 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
13.07.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.07.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.07.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.05.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.05.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2011 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.05.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2011 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
13.04.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2011 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2011 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.01.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2010 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.11.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
25.09.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.09.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.05.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2009 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.03.2009 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
25.03.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.03.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.03.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.03.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.03.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.03.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
60 |
|
25.03.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2008 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2008 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.03.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2007 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2007 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.11.2007 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.2006 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2006 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2006 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2006 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2006 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.06.2006 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.06.2006 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2006 |
Claim deemed abandoned |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2006 |
Invitation to pay claims fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2006 |
Invitation to pay claims fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.2005 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.2005 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
28.12.2005 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2005 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.12.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
28.12.2005 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2005 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2005 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.12.2005 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |