|
11.08.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.08.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
27.08.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.05.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.05.2020 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
101 |
|
16.03.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2020 |
Decision correcting errors |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.03.2020 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2020 |
F3033.1 Forwarding decision correcting errors to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2020 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.02.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.12.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
20.12.2019 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2019 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2019 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
9 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
9 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
9 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
10 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
9 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
15.05.2019 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2019 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
10.05.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.05.2019 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.04.2019 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2019 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2018 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2016 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2016 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
12 |
|
16.07.2015 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2015 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.05.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
9 |
|
01.05.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
9 |
|
01.05.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
9 |
|
01.05.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
9 |
|
01.05.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
8 |
|
01.05.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
01.05.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
8 |
|
01.05.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
01.05.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
8 |
|
01.05.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.05.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
26.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2014 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
23.12.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.12.2014 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2014 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2014 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
23.12.2014 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2014 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
05.03.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
05.03.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.10.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.06.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2012 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2012 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.02.2012 |
Amendments not yet acceptable |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.02.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.02.2011 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.02.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.02.2011 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2005 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2005 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
103 |
|
18.10.2005 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
89 |
|
18.10.2005 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
96 |
|
18.10.2005 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
96 |
|
18.10.2005 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
117 |
|
03.08.2005 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2005 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
31.05.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
59 |
|
31.05.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
63 |
|
31.05.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
31.05.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
73 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |