EP1584787 - High efficiency rotor for the first phase of a gas turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuovo Pignone Holding S.P.A. Via F. Matteucci 2 50127 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/41] | For all designated states Nuovo Pignone Holding S.P.A. 2, Via Felice Matteucci 50127 Florence / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noera, Frederico Via Mendozza, 3/3 16166 Genova / IT | [2005/41] | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [2013/37] |
Former [2005/41] | Pedder, James Cuthbert London Patent Operation, General Electric International, Inc., 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 05252182.0 | 07.04.2005 | [2005/41] | Priority number, date | IT2004MI00714 | 09.04.2004 Original published format: IT MI20040714 | [2005/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1584787 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1584787 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/14 | [2005/41] | CPC: |
F01D5/141 (EP,US);
F01D5/00 (KR);
F01D5/14 (KR);
F05D2220/3212 (EP,US);
F05D2230/90 (EP,US);
F05D2250/74 (EP,US);
Y10S416/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2013/03] |
Former [2005/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Niederdruckturbinenrotor | [2005/41] | English: | High efficiency rotor for the first phase of a gas turbine | [2005/41] | French: | Rotor d'une turbine à basse pression | [2005/41] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2012 | Examination requested [2012/51] | 10.11.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/26] | 10.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.12.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3475108 (ZICKUHR WALEMAR) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * * column 7, line 53 - column 8, line 19 * * column 8, lines 46-53 * * claims 1,4 * * figures 3,4,5a * [I] 3-7; | [I]US5160242 (BROWN WILMOTT G [US]) [I] 1-7 * the whole document * * column 13, line 65 - column 14, line 15 * * figures 7,11 *; | [A]EP0887513 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,4-7 * the whole document * * claims 1-6 ** figures 10,12 * | by applicant | US3475108 |