|
27.03.2020 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2020 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
26.02.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.02.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.02.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.02.2020 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.02.2020 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.01.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
14 |
|
14.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2020 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.01.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.04.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2019 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.04.2019 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2019 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2018 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.01.2017 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Description |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Description |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Description |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Description |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2016 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
20.05.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.05.2016 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2016 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.04.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
8 |
|
31.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
21 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
17 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2016 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.12.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
15.06.2015 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.06.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.06.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.03.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2014 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
38 |
|
07.02.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.10.2013 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2013 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2013 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
47 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
06.07.2012 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.2012 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.05.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2012 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2011 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.10.2011 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2011 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.07.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.07.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.07.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.07.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.07.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.07.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.07.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.07.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
11.05.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.12.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.10.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.04.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.04.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.04.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.04.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.04.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.02.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2010 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2009 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2009 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2009 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
23.01.2009 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.02.2008 |
Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2006 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
15.09.2005 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.09.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
15.09.2005 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2005 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.09.2005 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |