EP1674890 - Multilayer material and method of preparing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/26] | Multilayer material and method of preparing same | ||
[2017/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beneq Oy Ensimmäinen savu 01510 Vantaa / FI | [2013/08] |
Former [2006/26] | For all designated states Planar Systems Oy Olarinluoma 9, PO Box 46 002201 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAULA, Jarmo Reunaniitty 3 O FI-02200, ESPOO / FI | 02 /
HÄRKÖNEN, Kari Asematie 27 A FI-02700, KAUNIAINEN / FI | 03 /
NIKOLOV, Anguel 1905 Sunny Slope Rd 08807, BRIDGEWATER / US | [2018/22] |
Former [2006/26] | 01 /
MAULA, Jarmo Reunaniitty 3 O FI-02200, ESPOO / FI | ||
02 /
HÄRKÖNEN, Kari Asematie 27 A FI-02700, KAUNIAINEN / FI | |||
03 /
NIKOLOV, Anguel 1905 Sunny Slope Rd 08807, BRIDGEWATER / US | Representative(s) | Papula Oy Mechelininkatu 1 a 00180 Helsinki / FI | [2013/08] |
Former [2006/26] | Langenskiöld, Tord Karl Walter Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab, Iso-Roobertinkatu 4-6 A 00120 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 05397024.0 | 16.12.2005 | [2006/26] | Priority number, date | FI20040005495 | 21.12.2004 Original published format: FI 20045495 | [2006/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1674890 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1674890 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | [2010/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1674890 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G02B1/10, H01L21/316, C23C14/00 | [2006/26] | CPC: |
G02B1/10 (EP,US);
C03C17/3417 (EP,US);
C03C17/3694 (EP,US);
C23C16/403 (EP,US);
C23C16/405 (EP,US);
C23C16/45525 (EP,US);
C23C16/45529 (EP,US);
C23C16/45555 (EP,US);
H01L21/0228 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/22] |
Former [2006/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mehrschichtmaterial und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2006/26] | English: | Multilayer material and method of preparing the same | [2017/48] | French: | Matériau multicouches et son procédé de préparation | [2006/26] |
Former [2006/26] | Multilayer material and method of preparing same | Examination procedure | 09.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 01.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2005 | AT | 30.05.2018 | CY | 30.05.2018 | CZ | 30.05.2018 | DK | 30.05.2018 | EE | 30.05.2018 | ES | 30.05.2018 | FI | 30.05.2018 | IT | 30.05.2018 | LT | 30.05.2018 | LV | 30.05.2018 | MC | 30.05.2018 | NL | 30.05.2018 | PL | 30.05.2018 | PT | 30.05.2018 | RO | 30.05.2018 | SE | 30.05.2018 | SI | 30.05.2018 | SK | 30.05.2018 | TR | 30.05.2018 | BG | 30.08.2018 | GR | 31.08.2018 | IS | 30.09.2018 | IE | 16.12.2018 | LU | 16.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 16.12.2005 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PT | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PT | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4486487 (SKARP JARMO I [FI]) [X] 1,26 * figure 6 *; | [X]EP0945523 (SHINCRON CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,26 * paragraph [0022] *; | [X]US2004043260 (NADAUD NICOLAS [FR], et al) [X] 1-53 * example 3 *; | [X] - KATTELUS H ET AL, "LAYERED TANTALUM-ALUMINUM OXIDE FILMS DEPOSITED BY ATOMIC LAYER EPITAXY", THIN SOLID FILMS, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH LNKD- DOI:10.1016/0040-6090(93)90173-M, (19930325), vol. 225, no. 1 / 02, ISSN 0040-6090, pages 296 - 298, XP000358326 [X] 1,26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-6090(93)90173-M | by applicant | US2004043260 |