|
08.06.2012 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.05.2012 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.2012 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2012 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.2012 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.2012 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
30.03.2012 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
11 |
|
01.03.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
28 |
|
03.02.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2012 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.12.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.12.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.10.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.2011 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
9 |
|
01.07.2011 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.12.2009 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2009 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
25.08.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.08.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.08.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.08.2009 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.08.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.08.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.07.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.07.2009 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
31.07.2009 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.07.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.07.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
31.07.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
22 |
|
08.07.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
03.07.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
12.06.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.06.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.06.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.06.2009 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2009 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.06.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.06.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.06.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.06.2009 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2009 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.03.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.06.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2008 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
22.02.2007 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.02.2007 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.02.2007 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.11.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2006 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.11.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
07.11.2006 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.08.2006 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.08.2006 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.06.2006 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.05.2006 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
16.05.2006 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.05.2006 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.05.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
9 |
|
16.05.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
9 |
|
16.05.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
16.05.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
16.05.2006 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.05.2006 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.04.2006 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2006 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/405 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.02.2006 |
Non-unity - restrict claims/pay fees |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.02.2006 |
Non-unity - restrict claims/pay fees - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
29.09.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.09.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.09.2005 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.08.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
30.08.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
09.08.2005 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.08.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
18 |
|
29.07.2005 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.07.2005 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.07.2005 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
14.07.2005 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
14.07.2005 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
14.07.2005 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
03.02.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
03.02.2005 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
03.02.2005 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
17 |
|
03.02.2005 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
12 |
|
25.01.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.01.2005 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
25.01.2005 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
17 |
|
25.01.2005 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
12 |