|
11.01.2018 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2018 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2018 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2018 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2017 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2017 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.09.2017 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.09.2017 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.08.2017 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2017 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.07.2017 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.07.2017 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.07.2017 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Brief communication in opposition procedure - time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Brief communication in opposition procedure - time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.12.2016 |
Description |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2016 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.09.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2016 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.09.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
32 |
|
14.07.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2016 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.05.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2016 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.04.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.04.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.03.2016 |
All other documents for the Appeal procedure not covered by any other Code |
Appeal |
54 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
37 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
82 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
04.03.2016 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.02.2016 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
54 |
|
14.12.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
01.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2015 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.11.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.10.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.10.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.10.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
25 |
|
04.11.2013 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2013 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2013 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2013 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.08.2013 |
Communication of amended entries |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
22 |
|
23.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.05.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2013 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2013 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
163 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
22 |
|
14.02.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.02.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.01.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.01.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
20 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.11.2012 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.10.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
26.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.09.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.09.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.09.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.09.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.09.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.09.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
18 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
14 |
|
07.08.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
27.12.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2011 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
27 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
02.11.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2011 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2011 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2011 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.04.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.04.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.04.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.02.2011 |
Reply to the communication concerning admissibility of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2011 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2011 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
17.11.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2010 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2010 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
23.07.2010 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
23.07.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2010 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.12.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.08.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
19.08.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2009 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2007 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.11.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.11.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.11.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.11.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.07.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.07.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2007 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.07.2006 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.07.2006 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.07.2006 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.07.2006 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.06.2006 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
02.06.2006 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.06.2006 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.06.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
02.06.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
02.06.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
02.06.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
02.06.2006 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.06.2006 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.04.2006 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2006 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.02.2006 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.01.2006 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
26.01.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
26.01.2006 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
26.01.2006 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
26.01.2006 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
12.01.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.01.2006 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
01.09.2005 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
23.02.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
23.02.2005 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
23.02.2005 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
11 |