EP1734912 - APPARATUS FOR REHABILITATION AND TRAINING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/52] | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR REHABILITATION AND TRAINING | ||
[2018/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motorika Ltd. Canon's Court 22 Victoria Street Hamilton 12 Hamilton / BM | [2018/39] |
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states Motorika Ltd. Canon's Court 22 Victoria Street Hamilton 12 Hamilton / BM | ||
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states Motorika Ltd. Nerine Chambers Road Town P.O. Box 905 Tortola / VG | ||
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states Motorika Inc. Nerine Chambers P.O. Box 905 Road Town Tortola / VG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EINAV, Omer . IL-42875 Kfar Monash / IL | 02 /
EINAV, Haim 28 Shlush Street IL-65149 Tel-Aviv / IL | 03 /
ROUSSO, Benny 12 Henry Bergson Street IL-75801 Rishon Lezion / IL | 04 /
SHABANOV, Doron 34 Hadkalim Boulevard IL-44862 Zur Igal / IL | 05 /
KATZIR, Eran 12 Amnon Vetamar Street IL-48580 Rosh Ha'Ayin / IL | 06 /
BINYAMINI, Gad . IL-45870 Moshav Hagor / IL | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | Korenberg, Alexander Tal Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2018/39] |
Former [2013/28] | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2008/22] | van Westenbrugge, Andries Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2006/52] | van Westenbrugge, Andries Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 05703184.1 | 04.02.2005 | [2006/52] | WO2005IL00141 | Priority number, date | US20040542022P | 05.02.2004 Original published format: US 542022 P | US20040566079P | 29.04.2004 Original published format: US 566079 P | US20040566078P | 29.04.2004 Original published format: US 566078 P | US20040604615P | 25.08.2004 Original published format: US 604615 P | US20040633428P | 07.12.2004 Original published format: US 633428 P | US20040633442P | 07.12.2004 Original published format: US 633442 P | US20040633429P | 07.12.2004 Original published format: US 633429 P | [2006/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005074372 | Date: | 18.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1734912 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1734912 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.01.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61H1/02, G09B23/28, G09B23/32, A61B5/00, A61B5/11, A61B5/16, A61B5/22, A63B71/00, A63B21/005, A63B24/00, A63B21/00, A63B23/035, A63B23/12, A63B22/00, A63B71/06, A61B34/30 | [2018/11] | CPC: |
A61B34/30 (EP,US);
A61H1/02 (KR);
A61B5/16 (EP);
A61B5/7475 (EP,US);
A61H1/0237 (EP,US);
A61H1/0262 (EP,US);
A61H1/0274 (EP,US);
A61H1/0296 (EP,US);
A63B21/00178 (EP,US);
A63B21/00181 (EP,US);
A63B21/0058 (EP,US);
A63B21/4021 (EP,US);
A63B21/4043 (EP,US);
A63B21/4047 (EP,US);
A63B23/03508 (EP,US);
A63B23/1209 (EP,US);
G09B23/28 (EP,US);
G09B23/32 (EP,US);
G16H20/30 (EP);
A61B5/11 (EP,US);
A61B5/224 (EP,US);
A61B5/486 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0184 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1215 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1238 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1607 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1611 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1635 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1638 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1642 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1659 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5007 (EP,US);
A61H2201/501 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5023 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5038 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5043 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5048 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5058 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5061 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5064 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5069 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5092 (EP,US);
A61H2230/065 (EP,US);
A61H2230/085 (EP,US);
A61H2230/425 (EP,US);
A61H2230/505 (EP,US);
A61H2230/655 (EP,US);
A63B2022/0094 (EP,US);
A63B2024/0078 (EP,US);
A63B2071/065 (EP,US);
A63B2220/13 (EP,US);
A63B2220/16 (EP,US);
A63B2220/50 (EP,US);
A63B2225/50 (EP,US);
A63B71/0009 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/32] | A61H1/02, G09B23/28, G09B23/32 | ||
Former IPC [2006/52] | A61H1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/39] |
Former [2006/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | GERÄT FÜR REHABILITATION UND TRAINING | [2018/11] | English: | APPARATUS FOR REHABILITATION AND TRAINING | [2018/11] | French: | APPAREIL POUR LA REEDUCATION ET L'ENTRAINEMENT | [2018/11] |
Former [2006/52] | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT FÜR REHABILITATION UND TRAINING | ||
Former [2006/52] | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR REHABILITATION AND TRAINING | ||
Former [2006/52] | PROCEDES ET APPAREIL POUR LA REEDUCATION ET L'ENTRAINEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 28.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.02.2018 | 06.02.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.02.2005 | AT | 26.09.2018 | CY | 26.09.2018 | CZ | 26.09.2018 | DK | 26.09.2018 | EE | 26.09.2018 | ES | 26.09.2018 | FI | 26.09.2018 | IT | 26.09.2018 | LT | 26.09.2018 | MC | 26.09.2018 | NL | 26.09.2018 | PL | 26.09.2018 | RO | 26.09.2018 | SE | 26.09.2018 | SI | 26.09.2018 | SK | 26.09.2018 | TR | 26.09.2018 | BG | 26.12.2018 | GR | 27.12.2018 | IS | 26.01.2019 | PT | 26.01.2019 | IE | 04.02.2019 | LU | 04.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CY | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
IE | 04.02.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
IE | 04.02.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
IE | 04.02.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
IE | 04.02.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 26.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4936299 (ERLANDSON ROBERT F [US]) [X] 11* column 5, lines 58-62; figure - *; | [X]US5466213 (HOGAN NEVILLE [US], et al) [X] 11 * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 11 * * column 4, line 35 - column 7, line 2; figure - *; | [X]JP2002127058 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 11 * abstract * | International search | [X]US5244441 (DEMPSTER PHILIP T [US], et al); | [X]US5662693 (JOHNSON DAVID C [US], et al) | by applicant | US5466213 | US5836304 | - CHARLES G. BURGAR, MD; PETER S. LUM, PHD; PEGGY C. SHOR, OTR; H.F. MACHIEL VAN DER LOOS, PHD, "Development of robots for rehabilitation therapy: The Palo Alto VA/Stanford experience", Journal of Rehabilitation Research and Development, (20001100), vol. 37, no. 6 |