|
21.08.2018 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2018 |
Communication of the Registry during review procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.01.2018 |
Decision of the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure |
Appeal |
28 |
|
13.07.2017 |
Communication of the Registry during review procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.07.2017 |
F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.07.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during review procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during review procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.07.2017 |
Communication of the Registry during review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during review procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
05.07.2017 |
Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during review procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2017 |
Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal during review procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
28.04.2017 |
Communication of the Registry during review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2017 |
Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2016 |
Communication of the Registry during review procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.11.2016 |
Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2016 |
Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.2016 |
Letter relating to review procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.2016 |
Fax relating to review procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
21.10.2016 |
Fax relating to review procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
21.10.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.08.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.08.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
22.08.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
22.08.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.08.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.08.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.08.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2016 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.08.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2016 |
F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.08.2016 |
F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
30.07.2016 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.07.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.07.2016 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.06.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.06.2016 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.06.2016 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.06.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.06.2016 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.06.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.06.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.06.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.06.2016 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.06.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
08.06.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
102 |
|
07.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.05.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.02.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.02.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.02.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.02.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.02.2016 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.02.2016 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2015 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.07.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
10.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.03.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.01.2015 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.10.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2014 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.10.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
25 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
37 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
19 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
31 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
37 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
31 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
12.08.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.08.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.08.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.08.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.08.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.08.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.2014 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.08.2014 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.08.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
02.04.2014 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.03.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
13 |
|
03.03.2014 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
03.03.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
13 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.02.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2013 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.2013 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.11.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.09.2013 |
Request for acceleration of opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2013 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
13 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
14 |
|
01.05.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Invitation to file observations to notice(s) of withdrawal |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.08.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.07.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Communication of notices of intervention |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
31 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Intervention of the assumed infringer |
Opposition |
21 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Intervention of the assumed infringer |
Opposition |
21 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
21 |
|
23.03.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
21 |
|
23.03.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.12.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
14.07.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2011 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
02.05.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2011 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.02.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.02.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.02.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.02.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.02.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
37 |
|
04.02.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
04.02.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
04.02.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.02.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
04.02.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
04.02.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.02.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.02.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.02.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
04.02.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Correction to published European patent application/patent specification |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2010 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2010 |
Request for correction of the publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2010 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2010 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
23.11.2009 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2009 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.05.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2006 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
02.11.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2006 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
21.09.2006 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2006 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.09.2006 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
05.09.2006 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.09.2006 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.04.2006 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.04.2006 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.04.2006 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.04.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
18.04.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
18.04.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
18.04.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
18.04.2006 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.04.2006 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.04.2006 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.01.2006 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.01.2006 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.12.2005 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.12.2005 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.09.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.09.2005 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
18.04.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.04.2005 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
18.04.2005 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
18.04.2005 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
4 |