EP1723224 - SOLVENT COMPOSITIONS FOR REMOVING PETROLEUM RESIDUE FROM A SUBSTRATE AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Troxler Electronics Laboratories, Inc. 3008 Cornwallis Road Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | [2006/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZAKI, Nael, Naguib 221 Climbing Ivy Court Cary, NC 27511 / US | 02 /
TROXLER, Robert, Ernest 1609 Canterbury Road Raleigh, NC 27608 / US | [2006/47] | Representative(s) | Behnisch, Werner ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | Behnisch, Werner Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner GbR, Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05712312.7 | 01.02.2005 | [2006/47] | WO2005US02823 | Priority number, date | US20040791427 | 02.03.2004 Original published format: US 791427 | [2006/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005091771 | Date: | 06.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1723224 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1723224 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C11D7/26, C11D3/20, C11D3/18, C11D7/24, C11D3/43, C11D7/50, C11D3/50, C11D1/66, C11D1/52, C11D1/74, C11D11/00 | [2008/09] | CPC: |
C11D7/5022 (EP,US);
B08B3/022 (US);
B08B3/024 (US);
B08B3/026 (US);
B08B3/028 (US);
B08B3/04 (US);
B08B3/08 (US);
B08B3/14 (US);
C11D1/526 (EP,US);
C11D1/58 (US);
C11D1/62 (US);
C11D1/66 (EP,US);
C11D1/74 (EP,US);
C11D3/188 (EP,US);
C11D3/2003 (US);
C11D3/2041 (US);
C11D3/2093 (EP,US);
C11D3/28 (US);
C11D3/30 (US);
C11D3/3445 (US);
C11D3/43 (EP,US);
C11D3/50 (EP,US);
C11D7/248 (EP,US);
C11D7/266 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/47] | C11D7/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LÖSUNGSMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON ERDÖLRÜCKSTÄNDEN VON EINEM SUBSTRAT UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2006/47] | English: | SOLVENT COMPOSITIONS FOR REMOVING PETROLEUM RESIDUE FROM A SUBSTRATE AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2006/47] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE SOLVANT PERMETTANT D'ELIMINER UN RESIDU PETROLIER D'UN SUBSTRAT ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION DE CELLES-CI | [2006/47] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 28.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.10.2010 | BE | 20.10.2010 | CY | 20.10.2010 | CZ | 20.10.2010 | DK | 20.10.2010 | EE | 20.10.2010 | FI | 20.10.2010 | HU | 20.10.2010 | IT | 20.10.2010 | LT | 20.10.2010 | NL | 20.10.2010 | PL | 20.10.2010 | RO | 20.10.2010 | SE | 20.10.2010 | SI | 20.10.2010 | SK | 20.10.2010 | TR | 20.10.2010 | BG | 20.01.2011 | GR | 21.01.2011 | ES | 31.01.2011 | IE | 01.02.2011 | LU | 01.02.2011 | IS | 20.02.2011 | PT | 21.02.2011 | CH | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CY | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
TR | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IE | 01.02.2011 | ||
LU | 01.02.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CY | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IE | 01.02.2011 | ||
LU | 01.02.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IE | 01.02.2011 | ||
LU | 01.02.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IE | 01.02.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 20.10.2010 | |
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 20.10.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4956115 (VAN DE MARK MICHAEL R [US]) [X] 1,2,8,16-25 * claims 1,6-8,10,13,14,20-24,26,27 * * examples 21,22 * * column 1, line 10 - line 15 * * column 7, line 3 - line 9 *; | [A]WO0077135 (RAYTHEON CO [US]) [A] 1-25 * claims 1,7 * * example - * * figure 3 * * page 4, line 10 - line 18 * * page 3, line 1 - line 10 ** page 8, line 9 - page 9, line 3 * | International search | [Y]US5143639 (KRAWACK BORGE [DK]); | [Y]US6281189 (HEIMANN ROBERT L [US], et al); | [X]US2003213747 (CARBONELL RUBEN G [US], et al) | by applicant | US4956115 | US6281189 | US2003213747 |