EP1713549 - CHROMATIC ARCHITECTURE FOR SPORTS EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKE Innovate C.V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | [2014/32] |
Former [2006/43] | For all designated states NIKE International Ltd. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005-6453 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOYER, Clancy, G. 17355 S.W. Sumac Court Aloha, OR 97007 / US | 02 /
AVIS, Richard, G. 13648 S.W. Lauren Lane Tigard, OR 97223 / US | 03 /
REICHOW, Alan, W., @Pacific Uni. Col. of Optometry 2043 College Way Forest Grove, OR 97116-1757 / US | 04 /
CITEK, Karl, @Pacific Uni. Col. of Optometry 2043 College Way Forest Grove, OR 97116-1757 / US | [2019/27] |
Former [2006/43] | 01 /
BOYER, Clancy, G. 17355 S.W. Sumac Court Aloha, OR 97007 / US | ||
02 /
AVIS, Richard, G. 13648 S.W. Lauren Lane Tigard, OR 97223 / US | |||
03 /
REICHOW, Alan, W., Pacific Uni. Col. of Optometry 2043 College Way Forest Grove, OR 97116-1757 / US | |||
04 /
CITEK, Karl, Pacific Uni. Col. of Optometry 2043 College Way Forest Grove, OR 97116-1757 / US | Representative(s) | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [2019/27] |
Former [2012/13] | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/43] | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05712366.3 | 31.01.2005 | [2006/43] | WO2005US02904 | Priority number, date | US20040770862 | 02.02.2004 Original published format: US 770862 | [2006/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005075028 | Date: | 18.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1713549 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1713549 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A63B43/00, B44D3/00, B44F1/08, G01J3/52 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
G01J3/46 (EP,US);
A63B43/008 (EP,US);
A63B71/00 (EP,US);
B44D3/003 (EP,US);
B44F1/08 (EP,US);
G01J3/462 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/43] | A63B41/00, A63B43/00, A63B45/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2019/27] |
Former [2007/19] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | CHROMATISCHE ARCHITEKTUR FÜR SPORTGERÄTE | [2006/43] | English: | CHROMATIC ARCHITECTURE FOR SPORTS EQUIPMENT | [2006/43] | French: | ARCHITECTURE CHROMATIQUE POUR MATERIEL DE SPORT | [2006/43] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 18.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2009 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 23.07.2009 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 24.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2358904 (VARALE HENRI [FR]) [X] 1-22,28-30 * the whole document *; | [X]US5067719 (MOOK WILLIAM H [US]) [X] 1-22,28-30* the whole document *; | [X]US2002032076 (ISOGAWA KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-22,28-30 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO9826326 |