EP1722738 - COMPRESSION TREATMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2012/50] |
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERRY, Matthew, J. 30 Ledge Road East Greenwich, RI 02818 / US | 02 /
VESS, Mark, A. 303 High Street Hanson, MA 02341 / US | 03 /
WUDYKA, Scott 57 Wildflower Road Leominster, MA 01453 / US | [2006/47] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Edward James Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Tomlinson, Edward James Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/47] | Tomlinson, Edward James Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05713933.9 | 23.02.2005 | [2006/47] | WO2005US05598 | Priority number, date | US20040784323 | 23.02.2004 Original published format: US 784323 | US20040784607 | 23.02.2004 Original published format: US 784607 | US20040784604 | 23.02.2004 Original published format: US 784604 | US20040784639 | 23.02.2004 Original published format: US 784639 | [2006/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005082314 | Date: | 09.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1722738 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1722738 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61H9/00 | [2012/42] | CPC: |
A61H9/0078 (EP);
A61H23/04 (KR);
A61H2201/1645 (EP);
A61H2201/1697 (EP);
A61H2201/5002 (EP);
A61H2201/5007 (EP);
A61H2201/5071 (EP);
A61H2205/06 (EP);
A61H2205/10 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2006/47] | A61H23/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/47] | Title | German: | KOMPRESSIONSBEHANDLUNGSSYSTEM | [2006/47] | English: | COMPRESSION TREATMENT SYSTEM | [2006/47] | French: | SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT PAR COMPRESSION | [2006/47] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 23.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10185260.6 / EP2314268 | EP10185262.2 / EP2319476 | EP20170741.1 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.02.2005 | AT | 10.04.2013 | BE | 10.04.2013 | CY | 10.04.2013 | CZ | 10.04.2013 | DK | 10.04.2013 | EE | 10.04.2013 | FI | 10.04.2013 | LT | 10.04.2013 | MC | 10.04.2013 | NL | 10.04.2013 | PL | 10.04.2013 | RO | 10.04.2013 | SE | 10.04.2013 | SI | 10.04.2013 | SK | 10.04.2013 | TR | 10.04.2013 | BG | 10.07.2013 | GR | 11.07.2013 | IS | 10.08.2013 | PT | 12.08.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 23.02.2005 | |
AT | 10.04.2013 | ||
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 10.04.2013 | |
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | SI | 10.04.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0552515 (KENDALL & CO [US]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [X]US5575762 (PEELER DONALD H [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * column 5, line 9 - column 9, line 7 * * column 9, line 43 - column 10, line 26 * * column 10, line 65 - column 12, line 14; figure - *; | [X]GB2313784 (MEDICAL DYNAMICS LIMITED [IL]) [X] 1-25 * page 6, line 21 - page 7, line 1 * * page 7, lines 9-15 * * page 8, lines 14-19 * * page 12, line 9 - page 15, line 9; figure 3 *; | [A]US5795312 (DYE JOHN F [US]) [A] 1-25* the whole document *; | [X]DE19846922 (FERNANDEZ MANUEL [DE]) [X] 1-25 * column 3, lines 9-13,35-40,62-68 * * column 4, lines 22-29 * * column 4, line 55 - column 6, line 58; figures 2,3 *; | [X]EP1018329 (NITTO KOHKI CO [JP]) [X] 1-25 * paragraphs [0027] - [0044] - [0051] - [0057]; figures 3,6,9 * |