EP1735830 - MULTI-SUBSTRATE CIRCUIT ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007-5052 / US | [2006/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OMAN, Todd, P. 7103 East 50 North Greentown, IN 46936 / US | 02 /
DEGENKOLB, Thomas, A. 1606 Chestnut Court Noblesville, IN 46060 / US | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Denton, Michael John Delphi European Headquarters 64 avenue de la Pleine de France Paris Nord II B.P. 65059, Tremblay en France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2006/52] | Denton, Michael John Delphi European Headquarters, B.P. 65059 Tremblay en France 95972 Roissy / FR | Application number, filing date | 05725307.2 | 09.03.2005 | [2006/52] | WO2005US08067 | Priority number, date | US20040708935 | 01.04.2004 Original published format: US 708935 | [2006/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005104231 | Date: | 03.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1735830 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/14, H01L25/16 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
H01L25/162 (EP,US);
H01L23/367 (EP,US);
H01L23/49833 (EP,US);
H05K1/0203 (EP,US);
H05K1/142 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73204 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73253 (EP,US);
H05K1/0306 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0187 (EP,US);
H05K2201/1034 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10977 (EP,US);
H05K3/3421 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/52] | H01L23/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRFACHSUBSTRAT-SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG | [2006/52] | English: | MULTI-SUBSTRATE CIRCUIT ASSEMBLY | [2006/52] | French: | ENSEMBLE CIRCUIT A PLUSIEURS SUBSTRATS | [2006/52] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2006 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 14.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/27] | 17.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3952231 (DAVIDSON LEWIS A, et al) [X] 1-5 * column 5, line 21 - column 6, line 27; figures 3A,3B * [A] 16; | [A]JPS62260350 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-20* abstract *; | [XAY]US5488256 (TSUNODA TETSUJIRO [JP]) [X] 1,3-5,11-14 * column 2, line 7 - column 3, line 2; figures 10,11 * * column 4, line 33 - column 5, line 36; figures 1A,1B,2A,2B * [A] 2 [Y] 6-10,15,17-20; | [Y]US6365964 (KOORS MARK ANTHONY [US], et al) [Y] 6-10,15,17-20 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US5936843 (OHSHIMA OSAMU [JP], et al); | [Y]US6365964 (KOORS MARK ANTHONY [US], et al) |