EP1713624 - FUNCTIONAL ELEMENT FASTENED TO AN ARTICLE OF DAILY USE AND COMPRISING A TRANSPARENT SOFT SYNTHETIC ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WERA WERK HERMANN WERNER GmbH & Co. KG Korzerter Strasse 21-25 D-42349 Wuppertal / DE | [2006/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABEL, Michael Ülfe-Wuppertal-Strasse 13 42477 Radevormwald / DE | 02 /
STRAUCH, Martin Oberheidter Strasse 10 42349 Wuppertal / DE | 03 /
AMTENBRINK, Klaus Obere Lichtenplatzer Strasse 119 42287 Wuppertal / DE | [2006/43] | Representative(s) | Grundmann, Dirk, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/43] | Grundmann, Dirk, et al c/o Rieder & Partner, Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 05726414.5 | 10.02.2005 | [2006/43] | WO2005EP50588 | Priority number, date | DE20041006913 | 12.02.2004 Original published format: DE102004006913 | [2006/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005077609 | Date: | 25.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1713624 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1713624 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B25G1/00, B25G1/10, G09F7/12, G05G1/02 | [2006/43] | CPC: |
G09F3/00 (EP);
B25G1/00 (EP);
B25G1/105 (EP);
G09F23/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUNKTIONSELEMENT AN EINEM GEBRAUCHSGEGENSTAND AUFWEISEND EINEN TRANSPARENTEN WEICHKUNSTSTOFFK RPER | [2006/43] | English: | FUNCTIONAL ELEMENT FASTENED TO AN ARTICLE OF DAILY USE AND COMPRISING A TRANSPARENT SOFT SYNTHETIC ELEMENT | [2006/43] | French: | ELEMENT FONCTIONNEL FIXE SUR UN OBJET USUEL PRESENTANT UN CORPS EN PLASTIQUE SOUPLE TRANSPARENT | [2006/43] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 06.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.09.2007 | CZ | 05.09.2007 | DK | 05.09.2007 | EE | 05.09.2007 | FI | 05.09.2007 | IE | 05.09.2007 | LT | 05.09.2007 | NL | 05.09.2007 | PL | 05.09.2007 | RO | 05.09.2007 | SI | 05.09.2007 | SK | 05.09.2007 | TR | 05.09.2007 | BG | 05.12.2007 | GR | 06.12.2007 | ES | 16.12.2007 | IS | 05.01.2008 | PT | 06.02.2008 | AT | 10.02.2008 | LU | 10.02.2008 | BE | 28.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | IT | 29.02.2008 | HU | 06.03.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/39] | CY | 05.09.2007 | |
CZ | 05.09.2007 | ||
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
LT | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
PL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SI | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
TR | 05.09.2007 | ||
BG | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
IS | 05.01.2008 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
AT | 10.02.2008 | ||
LU | 10.02.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
HU | 06.03.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 05.09.2007 | |
CZ | 05.09.2007 | ||
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
LT | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
PL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SI | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
BG | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
IS | 05.01.2008 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
AT | 10.02.2008 | ||
LU | 10.02.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/48] | CY | 05.09.2007 | |
CZ | 05.09.2007 | ||
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
LT | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
PL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SI | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
BG | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
IS | 05.01.2008 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
AT | 10.02.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 05.09.2007 | |
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
LT | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
PL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SI | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
IS | 05.01.2008 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
AT | 10.02.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | CZ | 05.09.2007 | |
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
LT | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
PL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
IS | 05.01.2008 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
AT | 10.02.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 05.09.2007 | |
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
LT | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
PL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
IS | 05.01.2008 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | CZ | 05.09.2007 | |
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
LT | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
PL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
IS | 05.01.2008 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 05.09.2007 | |
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
LT | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
PL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
IS | 05.01.2008 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | CZ | 05.09.2007 | |
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
LT | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
PL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
IS | 05.01.2008 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | CZ | 05.09.2007 | |
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
LT | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
PL | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
IS | 05.01.2008 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/22] | FI | 05.09.2007 | |
LT | 05.09.2007 | ||
PL | 05.09.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | FI | 05.09.2007 | |
LT | 05.09.2007 | ||
PL | 05.09.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | FI | 05.09.2007 | |
LT | 05.09.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | LT | 05.09.2007 | |
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | LT | 05.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4259388 (REED ROBERT W) [X] 1,2,7,8,10 * column 1, lines 24-31 * * column 3, lines 55-63 * * column 4, lines 1-5; figure - *; | [A]DE3129438 (STRASMANN & ZIMMERMANN [DE]) [A] 1,2 * page 6, lines 3-30; claim 1 ** page 7, lines 15-23; figure - *; | [X]US5508984 (GOTO SOJU [JP]) [X] 1,5 * column 1, lines 16-20 * * column 10, lines 21-29 * * column 12, lines 25-47; figures 2b,2c,2f *; | [DX]US5601003 (AMTENBRINK KLAUS [DE], et al) [DX] 2,3,9 * abstract *; | [DX]DE20120741U (WERNER HERMANN WERA WERKE [DE]) [DX] 8,10 * figure - *; | [X]US2004020754 (SULLIVAN MICHAEL J [US]) [X] 1,4-7 * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0025]; figures 1,2 * |