blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1756847

EP1756847 - MAGNETIC SWITCH ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR OBTAINING A DIFFERENTIAL MAGNETIC SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.09.2008
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 05.01.2011  [2011/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VOLVO LASTVAGNAR AB
405 08 Göteborg / SE
[2007/09]
Inventor(s)01 / VAN GLABEKE, Pierre
Leopoldln 83
B-9900 Eeklo / BE
 [2007/09]
Representative(s)Fröhling, Werner Otto
Volvo Technology Corporation
Corporate Patents 06820, M1.7
405 08 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2007/09]Fröhling, Werner Otto
Volvo Technology Corporation, Corporate Patents, 06820, M1.7
405 08 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date05741957.419.05.2005
[2007/09]
WO2005SE00744
Priority number, dateSE2004000131119.05.2004         Original published format: SE 0401311
[2007/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2005112063
Date:24.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1756847
Date:28.02.2007
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2007/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1756847
Date:14.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE24.11.2005
ClassificationIPC:H01H36/00
[2007/09]
CPC:
H01H36/0013 (EP,US); H01H36/002 (EP,SE,US); H01H36/0026 (EP,SE,US);
H01H36/0073 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MAGNETSCHALTERANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERHALT EINES DIFFERENZMAGNETSCHALTERS[2007/09]
English:MAGNETIC SWITCH ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR OBTAINING A DIFFERENTIAL MAGNETIC SWITCH[2007/09]
French:DISPOSITIF D'INTERRUPTEUR MAGNETIQUE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'INTERRUPTEUR MAGNETIQUE DIFFERENTIEL[2007/09]
Entry into regional phase19.12.2006National basic fee paid 
19.12.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.2006Examination requested  [2007/09]
18.05.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.09.2007Fee for grant paid
28.09.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.08.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.11.2007
BE14.11.2007
BG14.11.2007
CH14.11.2007
CY14.11.2007
CZ14.11.2007
DK14.11.2007
EE14.11.2007
FI14.11.2007
LI14.11.2007
LT14.11.2007
NL14.11.2007
PL14.11.2007
RO14.11.2007
SI14.11.2007
SK14.11.2007
TR14.11.2007
GR15.02.2008
ES25.02.2008
IS14.03.2008
PT14.04.2008
HU15.05.2008
IE19.05.2008
LU19.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
[2011/01]
Former [2010/39]AT14.11.2007
BE14.11.2007
CH14.11.2007
CY14.11.2007
CZ14.11.2007
DK14.11.2007
EE14.11.2007
FI14.11.2007
LI14.11.2007
LT14.11.2007
NL14.11.2007
PL14.11.2007
RO14.11.2007
SI14.11.2007
SK14.11.2007
TR14.11.2007
GR15.02.2008
ES25.02.2008
IS14.03.2008
PT14.04.2008
HU15.05.2008
IE19.05.2008
LU19.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
Former [2010/33]AT14.11.2007
BE14.11.2007
CH14.11.2007
CY14.11.2007
CZ14.11.2007
DK14.11.2007
EE14.11.2007
FI14.11.2007
LI14.11.2007
LT14.11.2007
NL14.11.2007
PL14.11.2007
RO14.11.2007
SI14.11.2007
SK14.11.2007
GR15.02.2008
ES25.02.2008
IS14.03.2008
PT14.04.2008
IE19.05.2008
LU19.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
Former [2009/48]AT14.11.2007
BE14.11.2007
CH14.11.2007
CY14.11.2007
CZ14.11.2007
DK14.11.2007
EE14.11.2007
FI14.11.2007
LI14.11.2007
LT14.11.2007
NL14.11.2007
PL14.11.2007
RO14.11.2007
SI14.11.2007
SK14.11.2007
GR15.02.2008
ES25.02.2008
IS14.03.2008
PT14.04.2008
IE19.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
Former [2009/27]AT14.11.2007
BE14.11.2007
CH14.11.2007
CZ14.11.2007
DK14.11.2007
EE14.11.2007
FI14.11.2007
LI14.11.2007
LT14.11.2007
NL14.11.2007
PL14.11.2007
RO14.11.2007
SI14.11.2007
SK14.11.2007
GR15.02.2008
ES25.02.2008
IS14.03.2008
PT14.04.2008
IE19.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
Former [2009/22]AT14.11.2007
BE14.11.2007
CH14.11.2007
CZ14.11.2007
DK14.11.2007
EE14.11.2007
FI14.11.2007
LI14.11.2007
LT14.11.2007
NL14.11.2007
PL14.11.2007
RO14.11.2007
SI14.11.2007
SK14.11.2007
GR15.02.2008
ES25.02.2008
IS14.03.2008
PT14.04.2008
MC31.05.2008
Former [2009/13]AT14.11.2007
BE14.11.2007
CH14.11.2007
CZ14.11.2007
DK14.11.2007
FI14.11.2007
LI14.11.2007
LT14.11.2007
NL14.11.2007
PL14.11.2007
RO14.11.2007
SI14.11.2007
SK14.11.2007
GR15.02.2008
ES25.02.2008
IS14.03.2008
PT14.04.2008
MC31.05.2008
Former [2009/04]AT14.11.2007
BE14.11.2007
CH14.11.2007
CZ14.11.2007
DK14.11.2007
FI14.11.2007
LI14.11.2007
LT14.11.2007
NL14.11.2007
PL14.11.2007
RO14.11.2007
SI14.11.2007
SK14.11.2007
ES25.02.2008
IS14.03.2008
PT14.04.2008
MC31.05.2008
Former [2008/42]AT14.11.2007
BE14.11.2007
CH14.11.2007
CZ14.11.2007
DK14.11.2007
FI14.11.2007
LI14.11.2007
LT14.11.2007
NL14.11.2007
PL14.11.2007
RO14.11.2007
SI14.11.2007
SK14.11.2007
ES25.02.2008
IS14.03.2008
PT14.04.2008
Former [2008/39]AT14.11.2007
BE14.11.2007
CH14.11.2007
CZ14.11.2007
DK14.11.2007
FI14.11.2007
LI14.11.2007
LT14.11.2007
NL14.11.2007
PL14.11.2007
RO14.11.2007
SI14.11.2007
SK14.11.2007
ES25.02.2008
IS14.03.2008
Former [2008/35]AT14.11.2007
CH14.11.2007
CZ14.11.2007
DK14.11.2007
FI14.11.2007
LI14.11.2007
LT14.11.2007
NL14.11.2007
PL14.11.2007
SI14.11.2007
ES25.02.2008
IS14.03.2008
Former [2008/29]AT14.11.2007
CH14.11.2007
FI14.11.2007
LI14.11.2007
LT14.11.2007
NL14.11.2007
PL14.11.2007
SI14.11.2007
ES25.02.2008
IS14.03.2008
Former [2008/26]CH14.11.2007
FI14.11.2007
LI14.11.2007
LT14.11.2007
NL14.11.2007
PL14.11.2007
SI14.11.2007
ES25.02.2008
IS14.03.2008
Former [2008/24]CH14.11.2007
FI14.11.2007
LI14.11.2007
LT14.11.2007
NL14.11.2007
PL14.11.2007
ES25.02.2008
IS14.03.2008
Cited inInternational search[A]FR1404208  (H TIEFENBACH & CO DR);
 [A]CH460127  (ZELLWEGER USTER AG [CH]);
 [A]DE1810153  (BALANCIERS REUNIES SA);
 [A]US5128641  (POSEY WILLIAM T [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.