EP1763329 - ABSORBENT INCONTINENCE ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paul Hartmann AG Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2007/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENNING, Markus Johann-Strauss-Str. 18 89547 Gerstetten / DE | 02 /
KESSELMEIER, Rüdiger Günter-Grass-Weg 2 89542 Herbrechtingen / DE | 03 /
KOCH, Christian Galgenbergstr. 18 89429 Bachhagel / DE | 04 /
RÖHRL, Wolfgang Böllstrasse 34 89542 Herbrechtingen / DE | [2007/12] | Representative(s) | Friz, Oliver, et al Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | Friz, Oliver, et al Patentanwälte, Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 05744535.5 | 22.04.2005 | [2007/12] | WO2005EP04365 | Priority number, date | DE20041021353 | 23.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004021353 | [2007/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005102241 | Date: | 03.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1763329 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1763329 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/56, A61F13/64 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
A61F13/64 (EP);
A61F13/5644 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABSORBIERENDER INKONTINENZARTIKEL | [2007/12] | English: | ABSORBENT INCONTINENCE ARTICLE | [2007/12] | French: | ARTICLE ABSORBANT POUR INCONTINENTS | [2007/12] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2006 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 03.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2009 | Observations by third parties | 04.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10006017.7 / EP2279715 | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.08.2010 | CZ | 04.08.2010 | EE | 04.08.2010 | FI | 04.08.2010 | HU | 04.08.2010 | IE | 04.08.2010 | LT | 04.08.2010 | NL | 04.08.2010 | RO | 04.08.2010 | SI | 04.08.2010 | SK | 04.08.2010 | TR | 04.08.2010 | BG | 04.11.2010 | GR | 05.11.2010 | IS | 04.12.2010 | PT | 06.12.2010 | LU | 22.04.2011 | BE | 30.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 04.08.2010 | |
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
TR | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
LU | 22.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 04.08.2010 | |
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
LU | 22.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 04.08.2010 | |
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CY | 04.08.2010 | |
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 04.08.2010 | |
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CY | 04.08.2010 | |
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 04.08.2010 | |
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | CY | 04.08.2010 | |
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 04.08.2010 | |
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | FI | 04.08.2010 | |
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | LT | 04.08.2010 | |
NL | 04.08.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2001023341 (KARAMI HAMZEH [US]) [X] 1-6,9,10,13-16,18-25* paragraph [0079]; figure 36 *; | [X]US2001034512 (KARLSSON KATHARINA [SE], et al) [X] 1-6,9,10,13-16,18-25 * paragraphs [0017] - [0022]; figure -; claim - *; | [X]US2002045881 (KUSIBOJOSKA LILJANA [SE], et al) [X] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [DX]EP1269949 (FIRST QUALITY ENTPR INC [US]) [DX] 1-3,5,6,9,10,13-25 * paragraph [0025]; figure -; claim - * | Examination | WO8604812 | EP1110529 | US6626881 | other | US6626881 |