|
15.02.2018 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2018 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2018 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.01.2018 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2018 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2018 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2017 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2017 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2017 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.10.2017 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2017 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2017 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2017 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
29 |
|
26.06.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2017 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.04.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2017 |
F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.03.2017 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2017 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2017 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2017 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2017 |
F3093 Taking of evidence: Summons |
Appeal |
8 |
|
16.01.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.2017 |
F3093 Taking of evidence: Summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.01.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.12.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.12.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.12.2016 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2016 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2016 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2016 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2016 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.06.2016 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.06.2016 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.03.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2016 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.03.2016 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
12 |
|
17.03.2016 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
12 |
|
16.03.2016 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.02.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.02.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.02.2016 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2016 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2016 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
02.10.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
7 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
24 |
|
05.09.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
03.06.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2014 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2014 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
25.04.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.03.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.02.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.01.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.10.2013 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.09.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.09.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.09.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.09.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.09.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.09.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
20.09.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
35 |
|
17.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.03.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.03.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.03.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2013 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
15 |
|
19.03.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.03.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.03.2012 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
20.02.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.01.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2012 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2012 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.2012 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2012 |
Invitation to file an authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.08.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2010 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2010 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2010 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2010 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.2010 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.06.2010 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2010 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
09.01.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.12.2006 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
27.12.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.11.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.11.2006 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
10 |