EP1756759 - ITEM CARRYING AT LEAST TWO DATA STORAGE ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICPA HOLDING SA Avenue de Florissant 41 1008 Prilly / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/37] | For all designated states SICPA HOLDING SA Avenue de Florissant 41 1008 Prilly / CH | ||
Former [2007/09] | For all designated states SICPA HOLDING S.A. Avenue de Florissant 41 1008 Prilly / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TILLER, Thomas Chemin du Cedre 21 CH-1030 Bussigny / CH | 02 /
ROZUMEK, Olivier Route de Monchuplyon 8 CH-1661 Le Paquier-Montbarry / CH | [2007/09] | Representative(s) | Bublak, Wolfgang, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/31] | Bublak, Wolfgang, et al Bardehle, Pagenberg, Dost, Altenburg, Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/31] | Hepp, Dieter, et al Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | ||
Former [2007/09] | Hepp, Dieter, et al Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 CH-9500 Wil / CH | Application number, filing date | 05750034.0 | 01.06.2005 | [2007/09] | WO2005EP52497 | Priority number, date | EP20040014303 | 18.06.2004 Original published format: EP 04014303 | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005124673 | Date: | 29.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1756759 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1756759 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/14, G06K19/08, G06K1/12, G06K19/06, G06K5/02 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
G07G3/003 (EP,US);
G06K19/10 (KR);
G06K17/00 (KR);
G06K19/08 (EP,KR,US);
G06K5/02 (KR);
G08B13/2417 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARTIKEL ZUM TRAGEN MINDESTENS ZWEIER DATENSPEICHERELEMENTE | [2007/09] | English: | ITEM CARRYING AT LEAST TWO DATA STORAGE ELEMENTS | [2007/09] | French: | ARTICLE PORTANT AU MOINS DEUX ELEMENTS DE STOCKAGE DE DONNEES | [2007/09] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 21.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.08.2011 | EE | 17.08.2011 | LT | 17.08.2011 | RO | 17.08.2011 | SI | 17.08.2011 | SK | 17.08.2011 | BG | 17.11.2011 | IS | 17.12.2011 | [2013/29] |
Former [2012/23] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | LT | 17.08.2011 | |
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 17.08.2011 | |
IS | 17.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2003186377 ; | [XY]DE4241663 (BORUS SPEZIALVERFAHREN [DE]) [X] 14 * column 2, line 21 - line 30 * [Y] 15; | [A]DE29912500U (HOLZ CHRISTIAN [DE]) [A] 8,9 * page 1 - page 2 *; | [X]US2001029857 (HEREDIA MIGUEL [DE], et al) [X] 10,11 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0022] *; | [X]US2002080994 (LOFGREN NEIL [US], et al) [X] 12,13,16-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0089] * * paragraph [0090] *; | [X]EP1231562 (HITACHI MAXELL [JP]) [X] 8,9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0036] , [0039] , [0040] , [0042] *; | [DXY]DE20301463U (HELICOM ENTWICKLUNGSGES [DE]) [DX] 1,2,4,6,7 * abstract * * page 1, line 41 - page 2, line 1 * [Y] 3,5,15; | [Y]US2004005418 (SCHMID GUNTER [DE], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0030] *; | [X]US2004066273 (CORTINA FRANCISCO MARTINEZ DE [MX], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,7 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0085] * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031105), vol. 2003, no. 11, & JP2003186377 A 20030704 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 5 * abstract * |