|
06.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2020 |
Withdrawal of application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.06.2017 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.06.2017 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
07.06.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.03.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2017 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
25.11.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.11.2016 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
11 |
|
23.11.2016 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2013 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2013 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2013 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.08.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.11.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.11.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.11.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.11.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.11.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.11.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.11.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.11.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.11.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.11.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.11.2011 |
Description |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.11.2011 |
Description |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.11.2011 |
Description |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.11.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.11.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
28.09.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.03.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
04.11.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2009 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2009 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2009 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2009 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2009 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2009 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
13.02.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.02.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2008 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2008 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2008 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.08.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.04.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2007 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2007 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2006 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.09.2006 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.01.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
08.07.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.07.2005 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
08.07.2005 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
10 |
|
08.07.2005 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |