|
21.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
27 |
|
09.03.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.01.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.01.2018 |
F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
21.12.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.12.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2017 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
5 |
|
14.11.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.11.2017 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.11.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.10.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.10.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
23.10.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
10 |
|
20.10.2017 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.10.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.08.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
15 |
|
28.07.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2017 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.05.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.05.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.05.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.05.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.05.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.05.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
54 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.04.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.04.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.04.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.04.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.04.2017 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Request for transfer of rights - opponent |
Appeal |
11 |
|
03.04.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.03.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.03.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.03.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.03.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.03.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2017 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2017 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.08.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.03.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.02.2016 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.01.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.10.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
15.10.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2014 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.02.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.02.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.02.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.02.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.02.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.10.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2013 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
45 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
18.07.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.07.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.07.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.07.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Annex |
Opposition |
45 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Annex |
Opposition |
46 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
29 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2013 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.03.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
55 |
|
01.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2013 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2013 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
13 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Observations by third parties |
Opposition |
9 |
|
14.02.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.08.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
22 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2012 |
Annex |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
11.07.2012 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.07.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.07.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
32 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.03.2011 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2011 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2011 |
Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2011 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
21.02.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.02.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.02.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.02.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
33 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
31 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
14.07.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2010 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.12.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
30.01.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.01.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.01.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.03.2007 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2007 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2007 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.12.2006 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.12.2006 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.11.2006 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.11.2006 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.09.2006 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
07.09.2006 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.09.2006 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.09.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
07.09.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
07.09.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
07.09.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
07.09.2006 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.09.2006 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.07.2006 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2006 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.05.2006 |
Free text |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.05.2006 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.05.2006 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.04.2006 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
13.04.2006 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
13.04.2006 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.04.2006 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.04.2006 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
18.01.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
29.12.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.12.2005 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
06.07.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.07.2005 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
06.07.2005 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
7 |