EP1768412 - CAMERA CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue, Suite 200 Torrance, CA 90503 / US | [2018/09] |
Former [2014/30] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue Suite 200 Torrance CA 90503 / US | ||
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006 Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIGAMI, Tomohide@c/o Matsushita El Ind Co, Ltd 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg., 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
MARUYA, Kensuke@c/o Matsushita El Ind Co, Ltd 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg., 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 03 /
OKADA, Susumu@c/o Matsushita El Ind Co, Ltd 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg., 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2018/09] |
Former [2007/13] | 01 /
ISHIGAMI, Tomohide c/o Matsushita El Ind Co, Ltd 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg., 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | ||
02 /
MARUYA, Kensuke c/o Matsushita El Ind Co, Ltd 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg., 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | |||
03 /
OKADA, Susumu c/o Matsushita El Ind Co, Ltd 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg., 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/09] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/13] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05757805.6 | 06.07.2005 | [2007/13] | WO2005JP12466 | Priority number, date | JP20040205157 | 12.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004205157 | JP20050189008 | 28.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005189008 | [2007/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006006465 | Date: | 19.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1768412 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1768412 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.01.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/196, H04N5/232, H04N7/18 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
H04N7/181 (EP,US);
G08B13/19641 (EP,US);
G08B13/19682 (EP,US);
G08B13/19689 (EP,US);
G08B13/19691 (EP,US);
H04N23/66 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/13] | H04N7/18, H04N5/232 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2018/09] |
Former [2007/42] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KAMERA STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2007/13] | English: | CAMERA CONTROL DEVICE | [2007/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE CAMÉRA | [2007/13] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2007 | Translation filed | 04.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 27.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.10.2017 | 02.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 06.07.2018 | FR | 31.07.2018 | [2019/23] |
Former [2019/21] | GB | 06.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4992866 (MORGAN JACK B [US]) [Y] 10 * column 2, line 63 - column 6, line 52; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0690628 (SENSORMATIC ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * column 4, line 37 - column 6, line 39 ** figures 1,2 *; | [XYI]WO9723096 (BELL COMMUNICATIONS RES [US]) [X] 1-4,6-9,11,12 * page 6, line 16 - line 22 * * page 11, line 1 - line 21 * * figures 3,5 * [Y] 10 [I] 5 | International search | [A]JPH0696378 (ELMO CO LTD); | [A]JP2003288005 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2003329662 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2004096794 (SYST FIVE KK) | by applicant | US4922866 | WO9723096 |