EP1745113 - NOVEL MATERIAL MIXTURES FOR USE IN ELECTROLUMINESCENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2007/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÜSING, Arne Liederbacherstrasse 5 65929 Frankfurt / DE | 02 /
SCHEURICH, René Bertha von Suttner Strasse 34 64846 Gross-Zimmern / DE | 03 /
HEUN, Susanne Am Carlusbaum 23 65812 Bad Soden / DE | 04 /
BACH, Ingrid Im Lorsbachtal 14 65719 Hofheim / DE | [2007/36] |
Former [2007/22] | 01 /
BÜSING, Arne Liederbacherstrasse 5 65929 Frankfurt / DE | ||
02 /
SCHEURICH, René Bertha von Suttner Strasse 34 64846 Gross-Zimmern / DE | |||
03 /
HEUN, Susanne Am Carlusbaum 23 65812 Bad Soden / DE | |||
04 /
BACH, Ingrid Im Lorsbachtal 65719 Hofheim / DE | |||
Former [2007/04] | 01 /
BÜSING, Arne Liederbacherstrasse 5 65929 Frankfurt / DE | ||
02 /
SCHEURICH, René Bertha von Suttner Strasse 34 64846 Gross-Zimmern / DE | |||
03 /
HEUN, Susanne Am Carlusbaum 23 65812 Bad Soden / DE | |||
04 /
BACH, Ingrid Gartenstrasse 2 65812 Bad Soden / DE | Application number, filing date | 05759201.6 | 10.05.2005 | [2007/04] | WO2005EP05021 | Priority number, date | DE20041023277 | 11.05.2004 Original published format: DE102004023277 | [2007/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005111172 | Date: | 24.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1745113 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1745113 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/06, C07F5/00, C09B23/14, C09B57/00, H01L51/00, H01L51/50, H05B33/14 | [2016/28] | CPC: |
H05B33/14 (EP,US);
C09K11/06 (KR);
C07F5/003 (EP,US);
C09B23/148 (EP,US);
C09B57/007 (EP,US);
H10K85/111 (EP,US);
H10K85/115 (EP,US);
H10K85/151 (EP,US);
H10K85/40 (EP,US);
H10K85/615 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1433 (EP,US);
C09K2211/185 (EP,US);
H10K2101/10 (EP,US);
H10K50/11 (EP,US);
H10K85/342 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/04] | C09K11/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/43] |
Former [2007/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | NEUE MATERIALMISCHUNGEN FÜR DIE ELEKTROLUMINESZENZ | [2007/04] | English: | NOVEL MATERIAL MIXTURES FOR USE IN ELECTROLUMINESCENCE | [2007/04] | French: | NOUVEAUX MELANGES DE MATERIAUX POUR APPLICATIONS ELECTROLUMINESCENTES | [2007/04] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 14.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.06.2016 | 27.06.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.05.2007 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.05.2005 | CY | 26.10.2016 | CZ | 26.10.2016 | DK | 26.10.2016 | EE | 26.10.2016 | ES | 26.10.2016 | FI | 26.10.2016 | IT | 26.10.2016 | LT | 26.10.2016 | MC | 26.10.2016 | NL | 26.10.2016 | PL | 26.10.2016 | RO | 26.10.2016 | SE | 26.10.2016 | SI | 26.10.2016 | SK | 26.10.2016 | TR | 26.10.2016 | BG | 26.01.2017 | GR | 27.01.2017 | IS | 26.02.2017 | PT | 27.02.2017 | AT | 10.05.2017 | IE | 10.05.2017 | LU | 10.05.2017 | BE | 31.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | FR | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 10.05.2005 | |
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
AT | 10.05.2017 | ||
IE | 10.05.2017 | ||
LU | 10.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 10.05.2005 | |
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
AT | 10.05.2017 | ||
IE | 10.05.2017 | ||
LU | 10.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 26.10.2016 | |
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
AT | 10.05.2017 | ||
IE | 10.05.2017 | ||
LU | 10.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | CZ | 26.10.2016 | |
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
IE | 10.05.2017 | ||
LU | 10.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 26.10.2016 | |
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
IE | 10.05.2017 | ||
LU | 10.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | CZ | 26.10.2016 | |
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
LU | 10.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 26.10.2016 | |
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 26.10.2016 | |
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | CZ | 26.10.2016 | |
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 26.10.2016 | |
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 26.10.2016 | |
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 26.10.2016 | |
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 26.10.2016 | |
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | DK | 26.10.2016 | |
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | ES | 26.10.2016 | |
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03092334 (JAPAN BROADCASTING CORP [JP], et al); | [A]WO2004015025 (DU PONT [US]); | Examination | DE10238903 | WO2005040302 |