blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1755495

EP1755495 - THREE-DIMENSIONAL ANULOPLASTY RING AND TEMPLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.05.2011
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.06.2011  [2011/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Edwards Lifesciences Corporation
One Edwards Way
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
[2007/09]
Inventor(s)01 / McCARTHY, Patrick, M.
1833 Mohawk
Chicago, IL 60614 / US
02 / RHEE, Richard, S.
24344 Darren Drive
Diamond Bar, CA 91765 / US
03 / SCHRECK, Stefan, G.
2057 White Birch Drive
Vista, CA 92083 / US
 [2007/09]
Representative(s)Baker, Colin John
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/09]Baker, Colin John
Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date05760263.310.06.2005
[2007/09]
WO2005US20583
Priority number, dateUS2004086847014.06.2004         Original published format: US 868470
[2007/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2005122964
Date:29.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1755495
Date:28.02.2007
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2007/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.12.2005
ClassificationIPC:A61F2/24
[2007/09]
CPC:
A61F2/2448 (EP,US); A61F2/2445 (EP,US); A61F2/2466 (EP,US);
A61M25/001 (EP,US); A61M25/0069 (EP,US); A61M2025/0002 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0003 (EP,US); A61M2025/0004 (EP,US); A61M2025/0081 (EP,US);
A61M25/0032 (EP,US); A61M25/007 (EP,US); A61M25/0071 (EP,US);
A61M25/0138 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DREIDIMENSIONALER ANULOPLASTIERING UND SCHABLONE[2007/09]
English:THREE-DIMENSIONAL ANULOPLASTY RING AND TEMPLATE[2007/09]
French:ANNEAU TRIDIMENSIONNEL POUR ANNULOPLASTIE ET GABARIT[2007/09]
Entry into regional phase08.12.2006National basic fee paid 
08.12.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
08.12.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.12.2006Examination requested  [2007/09]
04.01.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/26]
07.02.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201006   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]WO03020178  (EDWARDS LIFESCIENCES CORP [US]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2002133180  (RYAN TIMOTHY R [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.