|
20.04.2022 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2022 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2022 |
Refund of fees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2022 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
18.01.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
18 |
|
18.01.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
18 |
|
22.11.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.11.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.11.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.11.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2021 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.07.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
16.07.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
31.03.2021 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2019 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.03.2019 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.03.2019 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
23.11.2018 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2018 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
05.10.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2018 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2018 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2018 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.08.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.08.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2018 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2018 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.03.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2017 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.11.2017 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2017 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.2017 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.08.2017 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.08.2017 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Opposition |
12 |
|
03.11.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.09.2016 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2016 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2016 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.06.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.06.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2016 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.05.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.05.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
25.05.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
26.08.2015 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.06.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2015 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.06.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.06.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.03.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2015 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
12.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the postal address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2007 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2007 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.12.2006 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.12.2006 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.02.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
26.01.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.01.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.01.2006 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
03.08.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
03.08.2005 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
03.08.2005 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
11 |
|
03.08.2005 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
14.07.2005 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
14.07.2005 |
Annex |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
14.07.2005 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
14.07.2005 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
11 |
|
14.07.2005 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |