|
30.10.2018 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
02.10.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2018 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2018 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2018 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Appeal |
6 |
|
18.07.2018 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2018 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.06.2018 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2018 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
08.06.2018 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
117 |
|
08.06.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2018 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
07.05.2018 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
08.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.02.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.02.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2018 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2018 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
23.06.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
19.06.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
19.06.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
19.06.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
19.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.06.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.10.2016 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.10.2016 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.08.2016 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2016 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.04.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.04.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.04.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.04.2016 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
14.04.2016 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
14.04.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.02.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.02.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.12.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2015 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.12.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.11.2015 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.11.2015 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
01.10.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.09.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2014 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.04.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2013 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
18.01.2013 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2012 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.02.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.04.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.11.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.05.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.05.2010 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.05.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.03.2010 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2010 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2010 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.02.2010 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2007 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.02.2007 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.07.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2006 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2006 |
Deficiencies in translation of international application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2006 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2006 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2006 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
15.05.2006 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.05.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.03.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
15 |