|
03.11.2016 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
10.10.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.09.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2016 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.08.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.08.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.06.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.06.2016 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.06.2016 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2016 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2016 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2015 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.03.2013 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.10.2012 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.07.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2011 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.02.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
07.01.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.01.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
07.01.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
07.01.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.01.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
03.01.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
03.01.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.2010 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
07.09.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.04.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.04.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.03.2007 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2007 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.01.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
11.12.2006 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.12.2006 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.03.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.03.2006 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
26.01.2006 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
01.08.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.08.2005 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
01.08.2005 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
10 |
|
01.08.2005 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
01.08.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |