EP1778953 - EXHAUST TURBINE CLEANING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Turbo Systems AG Bruggerstrasse 71a 5400 Baden / CH | [2007/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHELLENBERG, Peter Ehrendingerstrasse 43 CH-5408 Ennetbaden / CH | 02 /
BEHRENDT, Detlef Hofäckerweg 6 79790 Rheinheim / DE | 03 /
BÄTTIG, Josef Häbnistrasse 177 CH-5704 Egliswil / CH | 04 /
JUNG, Michael Blois-Strasse 38a 79761 Waldshut-Tiengen / DE | 05 /
MUELLER, Ferdinand Grossmattweg 3 79774 Albbruck-Buch / DE | [2007/18] | Representative(s) | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2009/26] | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP), Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2007/18] | ABB Patent Attorneys c/o ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 05767703.1 | 10.08.2005 | [2007/18] | WO2005CH00465 | Priority number, date | EP20040405513 | 16.08.2004 Original published format: EP 04405513 | [2007/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006017952 | Date: | 23.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1778953 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1778953 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/00 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
F01D25/002 (EP,US);
F01D25/00 (KR);
F02C7/00 (KR);
F05D2220/40 (EP,US);
F05D2240/12 (EP,US);
F05D2260/607 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/18] | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG EINER ABGASTURBINE | [2007/18] | English: | EXHAUST TURBINE CLEANING DEVICE | [2007/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE DE TURBINE | [2007/18] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 21.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.08.2005 | CY | 05.06.2013 | CZ | 05.06.2013 | DK | 05.06.2013 | EE | 05.06.2013 | FI | 05.06.2013 | IT | 05.06.2013 | LT | 05.06.2013 | LV | 05.06.2013 | MC | 05.06.2013 | NL | 05.06.2013 | PL | 05.06.2013 | RO | 05.06.2013 | SE | 05.06.2013 | SI | 05.06.2013 | SK | 05.06.2013 | TR | 05.06.2013 | AT | 10.08.2013 | IE | 10.08.2013 | LU | 10.08.2013 | BE | 31.08.2013 | CH | 31.08.2013 | LI | 31.08.2013 | FR | 02.09.2013 | BG | 05.09.2013 | GB | 05.09.2013 | GR | 06.09.2013 | ES | 16.09.2013 | IS | 05.10.2013 | PT | 07.10.2013 | DE | 01.03.2014 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
TR | 05.06.2013 | ||
AT | 10.08.2013 | ||
IE | 10.08.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
FR | 02.09.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GB | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
DE | 01.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
AT | 10.08.2013 | ||
IE | 10.08.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
FR | 02.09.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GB | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
DE | 01.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
AT | 10.08.2013 | ||
IE | 10.08.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
FR | 02.09.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GB | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
DE | 01.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
IE | 10.08.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
FR | 02.09.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GB | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
DE | 01.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
IE | 10.08.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GB | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
DE | 01.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
IE | 10.08.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
DE | 01.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
DE | 01.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
DE | 01.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
DE | 01.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | FI | 05.06.2013 | |
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 05.06.2013 | |
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 05.06.2013 | |
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 05.06.2013 | |
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 05.06.2013 | |
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 05.06.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB796269 (SULZER AG) [A] 1-8,11-13 * page 1, line 12 - line 62 * * page 2, line 31 - line 116 * * figure - *; | [A]EP0848150 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]) [A] 1-5,9,10,12,13 * column 2, line 23 - line 57 * * column 6, line 16 - column 8, line 3 * * column 8, line 32 - column 9, line 22 * * abstract *; | [A]DE19549142 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]) [A] 1-8,11-13 * column 1, line 25 - column 3, line 6 * * column 4, line 59 - column 6, line 54 * * abstract *; | [A]DE2008503 (VEB BERGMANN-BORSIG/GÖRLITZER MASCHINENBAU) [A] 1-8,11-13 * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 1 - page 4, paragraph 2 * * figure - * |